EP0732834 - System and method for determining and manipulating configuration information of servers in a distributed object environment [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.11.2003 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 06.02.2008 [2008/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SUN MICROSYSTEMS, INC. 2550 Garcia Avenue Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | [1996/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
McChesney, Roderick J. 28 Greenwood Lane Redwood City, CA 94063 / US | 02 /
Nuyens, Gregory B. 98 Maple Ave. Atherton, CA 94027 / US | [2003/14] |
Former [1996/38] | 01 /
McChesney, Roderick J. 28 Greenwood Lane Redwood City, CA 94063 / US | ||
02 /
Nuyens, Gregory B. 403 Laurel Avenue Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US | Representative(s) | Liesegang, Roland Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/38] | Liesegang, Roland, Dr.-Ing. FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38 80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96104079.7 | 14.03.1996 | [1996/38] | Priority number, date | US19950403337 | 14.03.1995 Original published format: US 403337 | [1996/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0732834 | Date: | 18.09.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/38] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0732834 | Date: | 27.12.2000 | [2000/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0732834 | Date: | 08.01.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.11.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/06 | [1996/38] | CPC: |
G06F9/44505 (EP,US);
H04L41/0853 (EP,US);
H04L67/01 (US);
H04L67/10 (EP,US);
H04L67/1001 (EP,US);
H04L69/329 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1996/38] | Title | German: | System und Verfahren zur Bestimmung und Behandlung von Server-Konfigurationsinformation in einer Umgebung mit verteilten Objekten | [2002/10] | English: | System and method for determining and manipulating configuration information of servers in a distributed object environment | [1996/38] | French: | Système et méthode pour la détermination et la manipulation de l'information de configuration des serveurs dans un environnement d'objets répartis | [1996/38] |
Former [1996/38] | System und Verfahren zur Bestimmung und Behandlung von Anbieterkonfigurationsinformation in einer verteilten Objektumgebung | Examination procedure | 09.05.1997 | Examination requested [1997/28] | 25.03.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 01.08.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.10.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 29.10.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP02019926.1 / EP1267550 | Opposition(s) | 09.10.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 08.01.2003 | SE | 08.04.2003 | [2008/06] |
Former [2006/03] | SE | 08.04.2003 | |
Former [2004/23] | SE | 08.04.2003 | |
DE | 01.10.2003 | ||
Former [2003/30] | SE | 08.04.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0472279 (DIGITAL EQUIPMENT CORP [US]) [A] 1-33 * column 2, line 40 - line 48 * * column 3, line 10 - column 4, line 20 ** column 15, line 19 - column 16, line 9 *; | [X]EP0529787 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [X] 1,19 * column 4, line 24 - line 44 * * column 5, line 4 - line 40 *; | [XA] - BETZ M, "OMG'S CORBA", DR. DOBBS JOURNAL,US,REDWOOD CITY, CA, (19941221), vol. 19, no. 16, pages 8 - 12, XP002018413 [X] 1,19 * page 12, column 2, line 27 - column 3, line 8 * [A] 2-18,20-33 | [XA] - "DISTRIBUTED OBJECT ACTIVATION AND COMMUNICATION PROTOCOLS", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN,US,IBM CORP. NEW YORK, (19940701), vol. 37, no. 7, ISSN 0018-8689, pages 539 - 542, XP000455609 [X] 1,19 * page 540, line 1 - page 541, line 13 * [A] 2-18,20-33 | [A] - LITTLE M C ET AL, "MAINTAINING INFORMATION ABOUT PERSISTENT REPLICATED OBJECTS IN A DISTRIBUTED SYSTEM", PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON DISTRIBUTED COMPUTING SYSTEMS,US,LOS ALAMITOS, IEEE COMP. SOC. PRESS, (19930525), vol. CONF. 13, ISBN 0-8186-3770-6, pages 491 - 498, XP000399421 [A] 1-33 * page 491, column 1, line 16 - line 30 * * page 492, column 1, line 35 - page 494, column 2, line 26 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICDCS.1993.287675 |