EP0732457 - Process and device for reclaiming grey water [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.03.2004 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.04.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): DK | published on 02.06.2004 [2004/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hansgrohe AG Auestrasse 5 - 9 77761 Schiltach / DE | [2003/21] |
Former [1996/38] | For all designated states Hans Grohe GmbH & Co. KG Auestrasse 9 D-77761 Schiltach / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hauser, Dieter Schuraer Strasse 56 78554 Aldingen / DE | 02 /
Heinzelmann, Werner Hauptstrasse 57 72275 Alpirsbach / DE | 03 /
Nolde, Erwin Bornemannstrasse 4 13357 Berlin / DE | [1996/38] | Representative(s) | Patentanwälte Ruff, Wilhelm, Beier, Dauster & Partner mbB Postfach 10 40 36 70035 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/38] | Patentanwälte Ruff, Beier, Schöndorf und Mütschele Willy-Brandt-Strasse 28 70173 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 96104085.4 | 15.03.1996 | [1996/38] | Priority number, date | DE1995109531 | 16.03.1995 Original published format: DE 19509531 | [1996/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0732457 | Date: | 18.09.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/38] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0732457 | Date: | 26.02.1997 | [1997/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0732457 | Date: | 21.05.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.01.1997 | Classification | IPC: | E03D5/00 | [1996/38] | CPC: |
E03B1/04 (EP);
E03B2001/045 (EP);
Y02A20/30 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [1996/38] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Wiederverwertung von Grauwasser | [1996/38] | English: | Process and device for reclaiming grey water | [1996/38] | French: | Procédé et dispositif de récupération d'eau usagée | [1996/38] | Examination procedure | 07.08.1997 | Examination requested [1997/41] | 08.08.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.02.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.07.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.11.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.09.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.03.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 14.03.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.02.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 05.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 21.05.2003 | IE | 21.05.2003 | DK | 21.08.2003 | GR | 21.08.2003 | PT | 21.08.2003 | SE | 21.08.2003 | [2004/23] |
Former [2004/15] | FI | 21.05.2003 | |
IE | 21.05.2003 | ||
GR | 21.08.2003 | ||
PT | 21.08.2003 | ||
SE | 21.08.2003 | ||
Former [2004/05] | FI | 21.05.2003 | |
GR | 21.08.2003 | ||
PT | 21.08.2003 | ||
SE | 21.08.2003 | ||
Former [2004/02] | GR | 21.08.2003 | |
PT | 21.08.2003 | ||
SE | 21.08.2003 | ||
Former [2003/50] | SE | 21.08.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3508885 (HAUPTMANN BERNHARD [DE]) [A] 1,8,14,17* page 9, line 2 - page 10, line 21; figure 1 *; | [XDA]DE3712421 (KRAFT HARALD [DE]) [XD] 1,3,4,11,12 * the whole document * [A] 6,7,9; | [XA]DE4228804 (KRAUS ROLF [DE]) [X] 1,3,4,7,11,13 * the whole document * [A] 2,5,6,10,14 |