EP0739034 - Integrated circuit device and fabricating method thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.09.2000 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 01.10.2008 [2008/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1996/43] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Inoue, Akira, c/o Mitsubishi Denki K.K. 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | 02 /
Goto, Kei, c/o Mitsubishi Denki K.K. 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | 03 /
Notani, Yoshihiro, c/o Mitsubishi Denki K.K. 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | 04 /
Nakajima, Yasuharu, c/o Mitsubishi Denki K.K. 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | 05 /
Matsubayashi, Hiroto, c/o Mitsubishi Denki K.K. 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | 06 /
Ohta, Yukio, c/o Mitsubishi Denki K.K. 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | [1996/43] | Representative(s) | Winter, Brandl - Partnerschaft mbB Alois-Steinecker-Straße 22 85354 Freising / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/40] | Winter, Brandl, Fürniss, Hübner Röss, Kaiser, Polte Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22 85354 Freising / DE | ||
Former [1996/43] | KUHNEN, WACKER & PARTNER Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22 D-85354 Freising / DE | Application number, filing date | 96104434.4 | 20.03.1996 | [1996/43] | Priority number, date | JP19950094963 | 20.04.1995 Original published format: JP 9496395 | [1996/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0739034 | Date: | 23.10.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/43] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0739034 | Date: | 14.07.1999 | [1999/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.05.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H01L23/66, H01L23/64, H01L23/498, H01L23/532 | [1998/49] | CPC: |
H01L24/49 (EP,US);
H01L23/66 (EP,US);
H01L2223/6644 (EP,US);
H01L2224/45144 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48091 (EP,US);
H01L2224/49175 (EP,US);
H01L24/45 (EP,US);
H01L24/48 (EP,US);
H01L2924/00014 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01005 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01006 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01013 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01014 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01047 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01079 (EP,US);
H01L2924/10329 (EP,US);
H01L2924/12042 (EP,US);
H01L2924/1306 (EP,US);
H01L2924/14 (EP,US);
H01L2924/19043 (EP,US);
H01L2924/19107 (EP,US);
H01L2924/30105 (EP,US);
H01L2924/30107 (EP,US);
H01L2924/3011 (EP,US);
H01L2924/30111 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
H01L2224/45144, H01L2924/00014 (US,EP);
H01L2224/45144, H01L2924/00015 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48091, H01L2924/00014 (US,EP);
H01L2924/00014, H01L2224/05599 (EP,US);
H01L2924/12042, H01L2924/00 (EP,US);
H01L2924/1306, H01L2924/00 (US,EP); |
Former IPC [1996/43] | H01L23/66 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1996/43] | Title | German: | Integriertes Halbleiterschaltkreisbauelement und Herstellungsverfahren | [1996/43] | English: | Integrated circuit device and fabricating method thereof | [1996/43] | French: | Dispositif de circuit intégré à semi-conducteur et procédé de fabrication | [1996/43] | Examination procedure | 15.01.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2000/46] | 20.06.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2000/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 30.03.2000 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2000 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH05226420 ; | [XA]JPH05235655 ; | [XA]GB1268175 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [X] 5,14 * page 2, line 46 - page 3, line 25; figures 1A,,1B * [A] 6,15-17,19; | [A]EP0169694 (RCA CORP [US]) [A] 7,8,18,19 * the whole document *; | [A]US4716389 (GAWRONSKI MICHAEL J [US], et al) [A] 7,8,18,19* the whole document *; | [XA]US4868637 (CLEMENTS JAMES R [US], et al) [X] 1,9 * column 3, line 18 - column 6, line 65; figures 1-6 * [A] 2-4,10-13; | [A]US5156996 (MILEY DANIEL J [US]) [A] 1-4,9-13 * the whole document *; | [XA]EP0520434 (HUGHES AIRCRAFT CO [US]) [X] 1,2,9 * column 4, line 30 - column 8, line 26; figures 1-3 * [A] 3,4,10-13; | [XA]US5237130 (KULESZA FRANK W [US], et al) [X] 1,9 * column 3, line 53 - column 4, line 32; figures 1-5 * [A] 2-4,10-13; | [A]EP0622840 (NEC CORP [JP]) [A] 5,6,14-17,19 * column 7, line 12 - column 9, line 10; figures 1,2 *; | [E]EP0736902 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [E] 7,8,18,19 * the whole document * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19931210), vol. 017, no. 672, Database accession no. (E - 1474), & JP05226420 A 19930903 (TOPPAN PRINTING CO LTD) [A] 1-4,9-13 * abstract * | [XA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19931217), vol. 017, no. 691, Database accession no. (E - 1479), & JP05235655 A 19930910 (TOSHIBA LIGHTING & TECHNOL CORP) [X] 7,18 * abstract * [A] 8,19 |