EP0736511 - Process for the preparation of diaryl carbonates [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.08.2000 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.08.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.10.2000 [2000/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAYER AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [1996/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Buysch, Hans-Josef, Dr. Brandenburger Str. 28 47809 Krefeld / DE | 02 /
Hesse, Carsten, Dr. Buschstrasse 151 47800 Krefeld / DE | 03 /
Rechner, Johann, Dr. Friedrich-Kramer-Strasse 2 47906 Kempen / DE | [1996/41] | Application number, filing date | 96104710.7 | 25.03.1996 | [1996/41] | Priority number, date | DE1995112616 | 05.04.1995 Original published format: DE 19512616 | [1996/41] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0736511 | Date: | 09.10.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0736511 | Date: | 27.10.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.08.1996 | Classification | IPC: | C07C68/00, C07C69/96 | [1996/41] | CPC: |
C07C68/01 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C07C68/01, C07C69/96 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [1996/41] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Diarylcarbonaten | [1996/41] | English: | Process for the preparation of diaryl carbonates | [1996/41] | French: | Procédé de préparation de carbonates de diaryl | [1996/41] | Examination procedure | 28.02.1997 | Examination requested [1997/18] | 29.12.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.04.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.08.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 10.08.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.07.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]DE2815501 (GEN ELECTRIC) [DA] 1 * page 1 - page 4; claim - * * page 18 - page 25; examples 1-15 *; | [A]EP0507546 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [A] 1 * column 9 - column 10; claim - * |