EP0736575 - Azamethine dyes with heterocyclic side groups [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.08.2002 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 30.07.2008 [2008/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | [2008/31] |
Former [1996/41] | For all designated states BASF AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schmidt, Andreas Johann, Dr. Franz-Liszt-Strasse 20c 67251 Freinsheim / DE | 02 /
Sens, Rüdiger, Dr. Medicusstrasse 12 68165 Mannheim / DE | [1996/41] | Application number, filing date | 96104862.6 | 27.03.1996 | [1996/41] | Priority number, date | DE1995112398 | 03.04.1995 Original published format: DE 19512398 | [1996/41] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0736575 | Date: | 09.10.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0736575 | Date: | 05.03.1997 | [1997/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0736575 | Date: | 24.10.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.01.1997 | Classification | IPC: | C09B55/00, C09B23/16, B41M5/38, C09B53/02 | [1996/41] | CPC: |
B41M5/39 (EP,US);
C09B53/02 (EP,US);
C09B55/009 (EP,US);
Y10S428/914 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI [1996/41] | Title | German: | Azamethinfarbstoffe mit heterocyclischen Seitengruppen | [1996/41] | English: | Azamethine dyes with heterocyclic side groups | [1996/41] | French: | Colorants azaméthiniques avec des groupes latéraux hétérocycliques | [1996/41] | Examination procedure | 12.02.1997 | Examination requested [1997/15] | 11.10.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.02.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.04.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.07.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.10.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.04.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.06.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 29.06.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.07.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0443045 (MITSUI TOATSU CHEMICALS [JP]) [A] 1-8 * abstract *; | [Y]EP0480281 (BASF AG [DE]) [Y] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [Y]EP0480252 (BASF AG [DE]) [Y] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [A]US5128312 (TANAKA MITSUGU [JP], et al) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [XY]US5216169 (YAMAZAKI SHIGERU [JP]) [X] 1 * example 52 * * the whole document * [Y] 1-8; | [D]US5225548 (BACH VOLKER [DE], et al); | [D]US5310942 (BACH VOLKER [DE], et al); | [PA]EP0701907 (AGFA GEVAERT NV [BE]) [PA] 1-8 * abstract ** page 22, line 37; claim 55 * |