EP0739148 - Systems and method for remote programming of mobile radio stations and mobile radio station therefor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1996/43] | System for remote programming of mobile radio stations and mobile radio station therefor | ||
[2011/33] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.04.2013 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.04.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.05.2013 [2013/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/11] | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [1996/43] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hofmann, Ludwig, Dipl.-Ing. Faber Ring 21 A 85304 Ilmmünster / DE | [1996/43] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2012/22] | Application number, filing date | 96105213.1 | 01.04.1996 | [1996/43] | Priority number, date | DE1995114716 | 21.04.1995 Original published format: DE 19514716 | [1996/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0739148 | Date: | 23.10.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/43] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0739148 | Date: | 11.08.1999 | [1999/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0739148 | Date: | 30.05.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.06.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H04W8/24 | [2011/33] | CPC: |
H04W8/245 (EP,US);
H04M1/72406 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1996/43] | H04Q7/32 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [1996/43] | Title | German: | Systeme und Verfahren zur Fernprogrammierung von Mobilfunkstationen und Mobilfunkstation dafür | [2011/33] | English: | Systems and method for remote programming of mobile radio stations and mobile radio station therefor | [2011/33] | French: | Réseaux et procédé de programmation à distance d'une station radio mobile et station radio mobile à cet effet | [2011/33] |
Former [1996/43] | System zur Fernprogrammierung von Mobilfunkstationen und Mobilfunkstation dafür | ||
Former [1996/43] | System for remote programming of mobile radio stations and mobile radio station therefor | ||
Former [1996/43] | Réseau de programmation à distance d'une station radio mobile et station radio mobile à cet effet | Examination procedure | 03.09.1999 | Examination requested [1999/44] | 07.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.04.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 25.06.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.07.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.01.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.11.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.03.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 05.03.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.11.2007 | Opposition(s) | 01.03.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/19] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 25.06.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 25.06.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 17.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 19.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 22.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 24.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 20.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 11.04.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 20.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 19.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 18.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 20.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 17 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 30.05.2012 | [2012/48] | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP0459344 (CIT ALCATEL [FR]) [X] 1,3,7,9,11 * column 3, line 31 - column 5, line 40 * [Y] 2,8,10; | [YA]US5400389 (NIIYAMA MANABU [JP], et al) [Y] 2,10 * column 3, line 60 - column 4, line 35 * * column 7, line 21 - column 9, line 38 * [A] 4-6; | [Y]EP0510322 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [Y] 8 * the whole document * |