EP0738045 - Analog-to-digital converter [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.08.2002 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 06.02.2008 [2008/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Infineon Technologies AG St.-Martin-Strasse 53 81669 München / DE | [2001/20] |
Former [1996/42] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kuttner, Franz, Dipl.-Ing. Dorfstrasse 12 9524 St. Ulrich / AT | [1996/42] | Representative(s) | Zedlitz, Peter, et al OSRAM GmbH Intellectual Property IP Postfach 22 13 17 80503 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/20] | Zedlitz, Peter, Dipl.-Inf., et al Patentanwalt, Postfach 22 13 17 80503 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96105426.9 | 03.04.1996 | [1996/42] | Priority number, date | DE1995113796 | 11.04.1995 Original published format: DE 19513796 | [1996/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0738045 | Date: | 16.10.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0738045 | Date: | 30.10.1996 | [1996/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0738045 | Date: | 04.10.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.09.1996 | Classification | IPC: | H03M1/18, // H03M1/46 | [1996/42] | CPC: |
H03M1/468 (EP,US);
H03M1/804 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1996/42] | Title | German: | Analog-Digital-Umsetzer | [1996/42] | English: | Analog-to-digital converter | [1996/42] | French: | Convertisseur analogique-numérique | [1996/42] | Examination procedure | 21.04.1997 | Examination requested [1997/26] | 03.03.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.07.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.02.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.03.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.06.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 20.06.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.07.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 04.10.2001 | [2008/06] | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4641130 (MASTROIANNI ANTHONY R [US]) [X] 1,2 * column 1, line 29 - line 39 * * column 2, line 30 - column 3, line 54; figure 1 *; | [A]EP0078608 (TEXAS INSTRUMENTS INC [US]) [A] 1 * figure 1 *; | [A]EP0064147 (TEXAS INSTRUMENTS INC [US]) [A] 5 * figure 1 * |