EP0742173 - Process for the preparation of abrasion-resistant sodium perborate monohydrate with high apparent density and high solubility [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.10.2000 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.10.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.11.2000 [2000/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Degussa GmbH 60287 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/36] | For all designated states Degussa-Hüls Aktiengesellschaft 60287 Frankfurt am Main / DE | ||
Former [1999/26] | For all designated states Degussa-Hüls Aktiengesellschaft 45764 Marl / DE | ||
Former [1996/46] | For all designated states Degussa Aktiengesellschaft Weissfrauenstrasse 9 60311 Frankfurt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pelgrims, Ivan Wild Veld 9 2550 Kontich / BE | 02 /
Klasen, Claas-Jürgen, Dr. Am Silberberg 19c 63579 Freigericht / DE | [1996/46] | Application number, filing date | 96105688.4 | 11.04.1996 | [1996/46] | Priority number, date | DE1995116609 | 10.05.1995 Original published format: DE 19516609 | [1996/46] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0742173 | Date: | 13.11.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0742173 | Date: | 08.12.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.09.1996 | Classification | IPC: | C01B15/12 | [1996/46] | CPC: |
C01B15/126 (EP,US);
C01B15/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, PT [1996/46] | Extension states | SI | 11.04.1996 | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von abriebfestem Natriumperborat-monohydrat mit hoher Schüttdichte und hoher Lösegeschwindigkeit | [1996/46] | English: | Process for the preparation of abrasion-resistant sodium perborate monohydrate with high apparent density and high solubility | [1996/46] | French: | Procédé de préparation du perborate de sodium monohydraté résistant à l'abrasion de densité apparente et solubilité élevées | [1996/46] | Examination procedure | 15.01.1997 | Examination requested [1997/12] | 29.10.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.02.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.07.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.11.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.03.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.06.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.07.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 06.07.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.09.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | PT | 09.03.2000 | [2000/43] | Documents cited: | Search | [DX]DE2650225 (INTEROX) [DX] 1,3 * claim - * * page 5, paragraph 1 - page 6, paragraph 1 * * page 7, paragraph 3 * * page 8, paragraph 2 * * page 10, paragraph 5 - page 11, paragraph 5 * * page 12, paragraph 4 - page 13, paragraph 2 * * table 3 *; | [DA]DE3941851 (DEGUSSA AG) [DA] 1* claim 1 *; | [A] - CHIANESE A ET AL, "The growth and dissolution of sodium perborate crystals in a fluidized bed crystallizer", JOURNAL OF CRYSTAL GROWTH, SEPT. 1989, NETHERLANDS, ISSN 0022-0248, vol. 97, no. 2, pages 375 - 386, XP002010930 [A] 1-4 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0022-0248(89)90219-4 |