EP0737754 - Lance for blowing fluid-state substances inside furnaces, particularly for steel production [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.06.2001 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.05.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 26.06.2002 [2002/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ELTI S.r.l. Via Nazionale, 62 24060 Sovere (Bergamo) / IT | [1996/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Macario, Federico Via Nazionale, 15 24065 Lovere / IT | [1996/42] | Representative(s) | Modiano, Guido, et al Dr. Modiano & Associati SpA Via Meravigli, 16 20123 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1996/42] | Modiano, Guido, Dr.-Ing., et al Modiano & Associati S.r.l. Via Meravigli, 16 20123 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 96105748.6 | 11.04.1996 | [1996/42] | Priority number, date | IT1995MI00782 | 14.04.1995 Original published format: IT MI950782 | IT1995MI02588 | 11.12.1995 Original published format: IT MI952588 | [1996/42] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0737754 | Date: | 16.10.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0737754 | Date: | 23.10.1996 | [1996/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0737754 | Date: | 09.08.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.09.1996 | Classification | IPC: | C21C5/52, F27D23/00, F23D14/32 | [1996/42] | CPC: |
C21C5/5217 (EP,US);
F23D14/32 (EP,US);
F27D99/0033 (EP,US);
Y02P10/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, IT [1996/42] | Title | German: | Lanze zum Einblasen fluider Substanzen in Öfen, insbesondere in Öfen zur Stahlerzeugung | [1996/42] | English: | Lance for blowing fluid-state substances inside furnaces, particularly for steel production | [1996/42] | French: | Lance pour l'insufflation de substances fluides dans les fours, en particulier dans les fours pour la fabrication d'acier | [1996/42] | Examination procedure | 15.04.1997 | Examination requested [1997/24] | 21.05.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.11.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.11.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.02.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.06.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.11.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.02.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 01.02.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.05.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 09.08.2000 | [2002/26] | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]LU49185 (CENTRE NATIONAL DE RECHERCHES MÉTALLURGIQUES) [X] 1,8-10 * page 5, paragraph 1 - page 6, paragraph 3; figure . * * page 5, paragraph L - page 6, paragraph 3; claim - * [Y] 2-7; | [XY]US5377960 (LECZO THEODORE J [US], et al) [X] 1,8-10 * column 5, line 59 - column 8, line 4; figure 3; claim - * * column 5, line 59 - column 8, line 4; figures 2,3; claim - * [Y] 3-5; | [X]FR2644558 (AIR LIQUIDE [FR]) [X] 1,8-10 * abstract *; | [Y]US4986847 (KNAPP HUBERT [DE], et al) [Y] 2,6,7 * abstract *; | [A]GB1072121 (BRITISH OXYGEN CO LTD) |