EP0743488 - Cooled grate bar [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.04.2001 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.04.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.05.2001 [2001/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Von Roll Umwelttechnik AG Hardturmstrasse 131-135 8005 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1996/47] | For all designated states Von Roll Umwelttechnik AG Hardturmstrasse 131-135 CH-8500 Zürich / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hauser, Rolf Am Binzikerbach 26 8627 Grüningen / CH | [1996/47] | Representative(s) | Schaad, Balass, Menzl & Partner AG Bellerivestrasse 20 Postfach 8034 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1996/47] | Patentanwälte Schaad, Balass, Menzl & Partner AG Dufourstrasse 101 Postfach 8034 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 96105982.1 | 17.04.1996 | [1996/47] | Priority number, date | CH19950001447 | 17.05.1995 Original published format: CH 144795 | [1998/12] |
Former [1996/47] | CH19950000447 | 17.05.1995 | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0743488 | Date: | 20.11.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/47] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0743488 | Date: | 29.07.1998 | [1998/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.06.1998 | Classification | IPC: | F23H3/02, F23H1/02, F23H17/00 | [1996/47] | CPC: |
B65G23/30 (EP,US);
B65G47/26 (EP,US);
F23H17/12 (EP,US);
F23H3/02 (EP,US);
F23H2900/03021 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1996/47] | Title | German: | Gekühlter Rostblock | [1996/47] | English: | Cooled grate bar | [1996/47] | French: | Bureau de grille refroidi | [1996/47] | Examination procedure | 19.12.1996 | Examination requested [1997/10] | 31.10.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2001/21] | 15.12.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2001/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2000 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH02106613 ; | [A]DE9416320U (NOELL ABFALL & ENERGIETECH [DE]) [A] 1-3 * page 1, line 1 - line 3 * * page 1, line 9 - line 13 * * page 2, line 25 - line 29 * * figure 1 * * page 8, line 21 - line 24; figures 2,3 *; | [PA]WO9518333 (DOIKOS INVESTMENTS LTD [GB], et al) [PA] 1,2 * page 26, line 15 - line 26; figure 3 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900709), vol. 014, no. 319, Database accession no. (M - 0996), & JP02106613 A 19900418 (HITACHI ZOSEN CORP) [A] 1 * abstract * |