EP0742147 - Dosing device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.08.1999 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.08.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.10.1999 [1999/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [1996/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Poglitsch, Erhard, Dipl.-Ing. Bruckwiesenweg 10 70734 Fellbach / DE | 02 /
Haarer, Rolf Sophienweg 6 73650 Winterbach / DE | 03 /
Voegele, Guenther, Dipl.-Ing. (FH) Cheruskerstrasse 19 71101 Schoenaich / DE | 04 /
Mueller, Peter, Dipl.-Ing. (FH) Limesring 41 73557 Mutlangen / DE | 05 /
Balange, Juergen, Dipl.-Ing. (FH) Mendelsohnstrasse 16 71332 Waiblingen / DE | [1996/46] | Application number, filing date | 96106163.7 | 19.04.1996 | [1996/46] | Priority number, date | DE1995116924 | 09.05.1995 Original published format: DE 19516924 | [1996/46] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0742147 | Date: | 13.11.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0742147 | Date: | 21.10.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.08.1996 | Classification | IPC: | B65B3/32, B67C3/20, G01F11/02 | [1996/46] | CPC: |
B65B3/32 (EP);
B67C3/206 (EP);
G01F11/021 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1996/46] | Title | German: | Dosiervorrichtung | [1996/46] | English: | Dosing device | [1996/46] | French: | Dispositif de dosage | [1996/46] | Examination procedure | 13.05.1997 | Examination requested [1997/28] | 26.11.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.02.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.05.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 25.05.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.07.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]EP0286785 (HAMBA MASCHF [DE]) [DA] 1 * figure 2; claim 1 *; | [A]DE2824942 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT) [A] 1 * page 5, line 1 - page 6, line 6; figure 1 *; | [A]FR2601327 (BENZ & HILGERS GMBH [DE]) |