EP0747674 - Photo-electric position measuring device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.05.2003 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.05.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.07.2003 [2003/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dr. Johannes Heidenhain GmbH Postfach 12 60 83292 Traunreut / DE | [2002/28] |
Former [1996/50] | For all designated states Dr. Johannes Heidenhain GmbH Postfach 12 60 D-83292 Traunreut / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Huber, Walter Wartbergfeldstrasse 20 83278 Traunstein / DE | [1996/50] | Application number, filing date | 96106330.2 | 23.04.1996 | [1996/50] | Priority number, date | DE1995121295 | 10.06.1995 Original published format: DE 19521295 | [1996/50] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0747674 | Date: | 11.12.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0747674 | Date: | 26.08.1998 | [1998/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0747674 | Date: | 10.07.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.07.1998 | Classification | IPC: | G01D5/38, G01D5/36 | [1998/36] | CPC: |
G01D5/38 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1996/50] | G01D5/38 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1996/50] | Title | German: | Lichtelektrische Positionsmesseinrichtung | [1996/50] | English: | Photo-electric position measuring device | [1996/50] | French: | Dispositif photo-électrique de mesure de positions | [1996/50] | Examination procedure | 26.02.1999 | Examination requested [1999/18] | 09.11.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.01.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.10.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.01.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.01.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 17.01.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.04.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS59132311 ; | [AD]DE3416864 (HEIDENHAIN GMBH DR JOHANNES [DE]) [AD] 1* the whole document *; | [A]DE3834676 (HEIDENHAIN GMBH DR JOHANNES [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US5260568 (IEKI ATSUSHI [JP]) [A] 1 * column 3, line 47 - column 5, line 44; figures 5,6 *; | [AP]DE4431899 (HEIDENHAIN GMBH DR JOHANNES [DE]) [AP] 1 * the whole document * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19841128), vol. 008, no. 259, Database accession no. (P - 317), & JP59132311 A 19840730 (SONII MAGUNESUKEERU KK) [A] 1 * abstract * | Examination | EP0163362 |