EP0750404 - Synchronisation in a spread spectrum communication system using a reference channel [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.03.2003 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.05.2003 [2003/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Zumtobel Aktiengesellschaft Höchster Strasse 8 6850 Dornbirn / AT | [N/P] |
Former [1996/52] | For all designated states Zumtobel Aktiengesellschaft Höchster Strasse 8 A-6850 Dornbirn / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Herter, Eberhard, Prof. Dipl.-Ing. Libanonstrasse 33 70184 Stuttgart / DE | [1996/52] | Representative(s) | Fleck, Hermann-Josef, et al Jeck, Fleck & partner mbB Patentanwälte Klingengasse 2 71665 Vaihingen/Enz / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/52] | Fleck, Hermann-Josef, Dr.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte A. Jeck & H.-J. Fleck Postfach 11 65 71697 Schwieberdingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 96106397.1 | 24.04.1996 | [1996/52] | Priority number, date | DE19951022421 | 21.06.1995 Original published format: DE 19522421 | [1996/52] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0750404 | Date: | 27.12.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/52] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0750404 | Date: | 17.05.2000 | [2000/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.03.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H04B1/707 | [1996/52] | CPC: |
H04B1/70753 (EP);
H04B1/7077 (EP);
H04B1/7085 (EP);
H04J13/0077 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, FI, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1996/52] | Title | German: | Synchronisation in einem Spreizspektrumübertragungssystem mittels Referenzkanal | [1996/52] | English: | Synchronisation in a spread spectrum communication system using a reference channel | [1996/52] | French: | Synchronisation dans un système de communication à spectre étalé utilisant un canal de référence | [1996/52] | Examination procedure | 17.11.2000 | Examination requested [2001/03] | 31.10.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/20] | 11.12.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2003/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2002 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US4641322 (HASEGAWA SATOSHI) [X] 1,2 * abstract * * column 6, line 19 - column 10, line 29 * * claims 8,9,12 * * figures 6-8,11 * [A] 8,11; | [XA] - NOUVEL F ET AL, "CODE DIVISION MULTIPLE ACCESS FOR AN AUTOMOTIVE AREA NETWORK OVER POWER-LINES", PROCEEDINGS OF THE VEHICULAR TECHNOLOGY CONFERENCE,US,NEW YORK, IEEE, (1994), vol. CONF. 44, pages 525 - 529, XP000496731 [X] 1 * Seite 526, linke Spalte, Zeile 26 - Seite 527, rechte Spalte, Zeile 12 * [A] 2 | [A] - MOON KYOU SONG ET AL, "REALIZATION OF POWER LINE MODEM USING A DIRECT SEQUENCE SPREAD REALIZATION OF POWER LINE MODEM USING A DIRECT SEQUENCE SPREAD SPECTRUM TECHNIQUE. SPECTRUM TECHNIQUE", PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON CONSUMER ELECTRONICS,US,NEW YORK, IEEE, (1993), vol. CONF. 12, pages 358 - 359-358, XP000427649 [A] 1-3 * the whole document * |