EP0742169 - Method and apparatus for tail sealing of convolutely wound webs [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 05.10.2001 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Paper Converting Machine Company 2300 South Ashland Avenue Green Bay Wisconsin 54307-9005 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1996/46] | For all designated states Paper Converting Machine Company 2300 South Ashland Avenue Green Bay, Wisconsin 54307-9005 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Vigneau, Richard J. 1380 Finch Lane Green Bay, WI 54313 / US | 02 /
Buxton, Gerald W. 127 South Bartlette Shawano, WI 54166 / US | 03 /
Dvorak, Richard C. 2372 Skyline Pines Drive Green Bay, WI 54313 / US | [1996/46] | Representative(s) | Ruschke, Hans Edvard, et al Ruschke Madgwick Seide & Kollegen Patentanwälte Patent Attorney (UK) PartG mbB Postfach 86 06 29 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/36] | Ruschke, Hans Edvard, et al RUSCHKE HARTMANN MADGWICK & SEIDE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 86 06 29 81633 München / DE | ||
Former [1996/46] | Ruschke, Hans Edvard, Dipl.-Ing., Patentanwälte, et al Rusche Hartmann Becker, Pienzenauerstrasse 2 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96106452.4 | 24.04.1996 | [1996/46] | Priority number, date | US19950437810 | 09.05.1995 Original published format: US 437810 | US19950575908 | 20.12.1995 Original published format: US 575908 | [1996/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0742169 | Date: | 13.11.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/46] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0742169 | Date: | 05.11.1997 | [1997/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0742169 | Date: | 23.12.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/52] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0742169 | Date: | 21.11.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.09.1997 | Classification | IPC: | B65H19/29 | [1996/46] | CPC: |
B65H19/30 (EP,US);
B65H19/29 (EP,US);
B65H2301/414421 (EP,US);
B65H2301/41445 (EP,US);
B65H2301/41447 (EP,US);
B65H2301/4172 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [1996/46] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Apparat zum Befestigen des freien Endes von aufgewickelten Bahnen | [1996/46] | English: | Method and apparatus for tail sealing of convolutely wound webs | [1996/46] | French: | Procédé et appareil pour fixer l'extrémité libre de bandes enroulées | [1996/46] | Examination procedure | 18.11.1997 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.11.1997 | Examination requested [1998/03] | 23.12.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.02.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.03.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.06.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.09.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 07.09.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
16.09.1999
ADMISSIBLE FABIO PERINI S:P:A: VIA PER MUGNANO 55100 LUCCA / IT Opponent's representative Mannucci, Michele Ufficio Tecnico Ing.A. Mannucci Via della Scala 4 50123 Firenze / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1999/45] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
16.09.1999
ADMISSIBLE FABIO PERINI S:P:A: VIA PER MUGNANO 55100 LUCCA / IT Opponent's representative Mannucci, Michele Ufficio Tecnico Ing.A. Mannucci, Via della Scala 4 50123 Firenze / IT | 29.10.1999 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 03.05.2000 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 06.03.2001 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 06.03.2001 | Date of oral proceedings | 02.04.2001 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 02.04.2001 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 26.07.2001 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 17.09.2001 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | |||
Former [2000/22] | FR | 21.05.1999 | Documents cited: | Search | [DXY]EP0623540 (CONSANI ALBERTO SPA [IT]) [DX] 1-6,14,16,17,20 * column 1, line 44 - column 3, line 34; figure - * [Y] 8,12,18,19; | [YA]JPS638164 ; | [YA]EP0541496 (PERINI FABIO SPA [IT]) [Y] 12,19 * column 3, line 35 - column 4, line 46; figures 1-5 * [A] 1,17 | [YA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19880614), vol. 12, no. 206, Database accession no. (M - 708), & JP63008164 A 19880113 (DAINIPPON PRINTING) [Y] 8,18 * abstract * [A] 1,17 |