EP0743721 - Optical amplifier [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.07.1999 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.07.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.08.1999 [1999/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALCATEL 54, rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | [1999/08] |
Former [1998/27] | For all designated states ALCATEL ALSTHOM COMPAGNIE GENERALE D'ELECTRICITE 54, rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [1996/47] | For:DE
Alcatel SEL Aktiengesellschaft Lorenzstrasse 10 D-70435 Stuttgart / DE | ||
For:ES
FR
GB
IT
NL
SE
ALCATEL N.V. Burgemeester Elsenlaan 170 NL-2288 BH Rijswijk / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Regener, Rolf, Dr. Wernerstrasse 11 71739 Oberriexingen / DE | 02 /
Schmitt, Gottfried Reutlinger Strasse 1 90441 Nürnberg / DE | [1996/47] | Representative(s) | Schätzle, Albin, et al Alcatel Lucent Intellectual Property & Standards 70430 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/47] | Schätzle, Albin, Dipl.-Phys., et al c/o Alcatel Alsthom, Intellectual Property Department, P.O. Box 30 09 29 70449 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 96106595.0 | 26.04.1996 | [1996/47] | Priority number, date | DE1995118021 | 17.05.1995 Original published format: DE 19518021 | [1996/47] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0743721 | Date: | 20.11.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0743721 | Date: | 02.09.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.09.1996 | Classification | IPC: | H01S3/06, H04B10/17 | [1996/47] | CPC: |
H01S3/06754 (EP,US);
G02B6/42 (EP,US);
H01S3/06704 (EP,US);
H01S3/06787 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1996/47] | Title | German: | Optischer Verstärker | [1996/47] | English: | Optical amplifier | [1996/47] | French: | Amplificateur optique | [1996/47] | Examination procedure | 20.11.1996 | Examination requested [1997/05] | 27.10.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.03.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.06.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 15.06.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.06.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH0371115 ; | [AD]DE4027024 (STANDARD ELEKTRIK LORENZ AG [DE]) [AD] 1,5,9 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0527604 (LITTON SYSTEMS INC [US]) [A] 1,5 * page 11, line 33 - line 58 * * page 12, line 1 - line 54 * * figure 13 *; | [A]EP0595396 (PIRELLI CAVI SPA [IT]) [A] 1,5 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0640853 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [A] 1,7,9 * column 8, line 31 - line 58 * * column 9, line 1 - line 57 * * column 11, line 43 - line 58 * * column 12, line 1 - line 10 ** figure 6 *; | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19910614), vol. 015, no. 234, Database accession no. (P - 1215), & JP03071115 A 19910326 (NIPPON TELEGR & TELEPH CORP) [A] 1,2,5,9 * abstract * | [A] - BARNARD C W ET AL, "BIDIRECTIONAL FIBER AMPLIFIERS", IEEE PHOTONICS TECHNOLOGY LETTERS, (19920801), vol. 4, no. 8, pages 911 - 913, XP000293633 [A] 1,10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/68.149906 |