EP0739956 - Printing apparatus and recording solution [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.04.2001 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.06.2001 [2001/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1996/44] | For all designated states SONY CORPORATION 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fukuda, Toshio c/o Sony Corporation, 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Ando, Makoto c/o Sony Corporation, 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Ito, Kengo c/o Sony Corporation, 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo / JP | [1996/44] | Representative(s) | Müller, Frithjof E., et al Müller Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte Innere Wiener Strasse 17 81667 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/13] | Müller, Frithjof E., Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte MÜLLER & HOFFMANN, Innere Wiener Strasse 17 81667 München / DE | ||
Former [1996/44] | TER MEER - MÜLLER - STEINMEISTER & PARTNER Mauerkircherstrasse 45 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96106653.7 | 26.04.1996 | [1996/44] | Priority number, date | JP19950104275 | 27.04.1995 Original published format: JP 10427595 | [1996/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0739956 | Date: | 30.10.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0739956 | Date: | 18.03.1998 | [1998/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0739956 | Date: | 28.06.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.01.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C09D11/00, B41J2/01, B41J2/21, B41J2/195 | [1998/12] | CPC: |
C09D11/30 (EP,KR,US);
B41J2/175 (KR);
B41J2/01 (EP,US);
B41J2/211 (EP,KR,US);
C09D11/54 (EP,KR,US)
|
Former IPC [1996/44] | C09D11/00, B41J2/01 | Designated contracting states | AT, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1996/44] | Title | German: | Druckgerät und Aufzeichnungslösung | [1996/44] | English: | Printing apparatus and recording solution | [1996/44] | French: | Appareil d'impression et solution d'enregistrement | [1996/44] | Examination procedure | 19.08.1998 | Examination requested [1998/42] | 15.02.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.04.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.06.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 14.09.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 18.11.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.02.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 08.02.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.03.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]JPH0570727 ; | [A]JPS5723665 ; | [A]JPS6346277 ; | [XY]EP0538147 (SONY CORP [JP]) [X] 12,22-25,34 * column 8, line 14 - column 25, line 27; figure 1 * [Y] 1,2,9-11,26,27; | [A]EP0642924 (MATTHEWS INT CORP [US]) [A] 1,12,26,34 * column 6, line 1 - column 11, line 7; figure 1 * | [YA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930722), vol. 017, no. 391, Database accession no. (C - 1087), & JP05070727 A 19930323 (CANON INC) [Y] 1,2,9-11,26,27 * abstract * [A] 4,29 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19820602), vol. 006, no. 094, Database accession no. (C - 105), & JP57023665 A 19820206 (PILOT PEN CO LTD:THE) [A] 8,33,35 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19880722), vol. 012, no. 263, Database accession no. (C - 514), & JP63046277 A 19880227 (CANON INC) [A] 20,42 * abstract * |