EP0751654 - Frame synchronisation, particularly for MCM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.07.2005 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CH, LI | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [1997/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bolle, Michael, Dr. Ing. Pattenser Strasse 38b 30880 Laatzen / DE | 02 /
Stepen, Markus Schützenwiese 46 31137 Hildesheim / DE | [1997/01] | Application number, filing date | 96106815.2 | 30.04.1996 | [1997/01] | Priority number, date | DE1995123402 | 28.06.1995 Original published format: DE 19523402 | [1997/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0751654 | Date: | 02.01.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0751654 | Date: | 13.09.2000 | [2000/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0751654 | Date: | 25.08.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.07.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H04L27/26 | [1997/01] | CPC: |
H04L27/2656 (EP);
H04L27/2676 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, LI, SE [1997/01] | Title | German: | Rahmensynchronisierung, insbesondere für Mehrträgermodulationssignale | [2004/06] | English: | Frame synchronisation, particularly for MCM | [1997/01] | French: | Synchronisation de trame, en particulier pour signaux à modulation multiporteuse | [1997/01] |
Former [1997/01] | Rhamensynchronisierung, insbesondere für Mehrträgermodulationssignale | Examination procedure | 13.03.2001 | Examination requested [2001/19] | 05.08.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.12.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.02.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.06.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 23.06.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.05.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 03.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 25.11.2004 | ES | 06.12.2004 | CH | 30.04.2005 | LI | 30.04.2005 | [2006/14] |
Former [2005/23] | SE | 25.11.2004 | |
ES | 06.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/10] | SE | 25.11.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5191576 (POMMIER DANIEL [FR], et al) [A] 1-5 * column 1, line 56 - column 2, line 15 * * column 4, line 33 - column 4, line 49 * * column 5, line 3 - column 5, line 26; figures 1,2,3B * | [A] - WARNER W D ET AL, "OFDM/FM FRAME SYNCHRONIZATION FOR MOBILE RADIO DATA COMMUNICATION", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON VEHICULAR TECHNOLOGY,US,IEEE INC. NEW YORK, (19930801), vol. 42, no. 3, ISSN 0018-9545, pages 302 - 313, XP000394042 [A] 1-5 * page 305, column 2 - page 306, column 1 * * page 306; figures 7,8 * * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/25.231882 |