EP0740921 - Sheet dispenser [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.07.2001 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.07.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.09.2001 [2001/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fort James Corporation 1650 Lake Cook Road Deerfield, IL 60015 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1999/23] | For all designated states FORT JAMES CORPORATION 1650 Lake Cook Road Deerfield, IL 60015 / US | ||
Former [1996/45] | For all designated states PETTERSON, Tor H. 31248 Palos Verdes Drive West Rancho Palos Verdes, CA 90275 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Petterson, Tor H. 31248 Palos Verdes Drive West Rancho Palos Verdes, CA 90275 / US | [1999/23] |
Former [1996/45] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Louis Pöhlau Lohrentz Patentanwälte Merianstrasse 26 90409 Nürnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/45] | LOUIS, PÖHLAU, LOHRENTZ & SEGETH Kesslerplatz 1 90489 Nürnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 96106817.8 | 30.04.1996 | [1996/45] | Priority number, date | US19950433978 | 04.05.1995 Original published format: US 433978 | [1996/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0740921 | Date: | 06.11.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0740921 | Date: | 20.09.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.08.1996 | Classification | IPC: | A47K10/38 | [1996/45] | CPC: |
A47K10/3818 (EP,US);
A47K2010/3206 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, PT, SE [1996/45] | Title | German: | Blattspender | [1996/45] | English: | Sheet dispenser | [1996/45] | French: | Distributeur en feuille | [1996/45] | Examination procedure | 06.05.1997 | Examination requested [1997/28] | 25.05.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.11.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.03.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 31.03.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.06.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 28.06.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.06.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.1999 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   01.07.1999 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US5370338 (LEWIS RICHARD P [US]) [X] 1,3-8 * column 3, line 8 - column 4, line 62; figures 1-5 * [A] 2,9,10; | [AD]US5205455 (MOODY JOHN R [US]) [AD] 1,9 * column 3, line 7 - column 4, line 37; figures 1-3 *; | [A]EP0117074 (NISKE GERD ERDWIN [ZA], et al); | [A]US4462507 (MARGULIES HERMAN [US]) |