EP0743383 - Loom drive mechanism [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.12.1997 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.02.2014 | Change - classification | published on 12.03.2014 [2014/11] | 07.02.2014 | Change - classification | published on 12.03.2014 [2014/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TSUDAKOMA KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 18-18, Nomachi 5-chome Kanazawa-shi Ishikawa-ken 921 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1996/47] | For all designated states TSUDAKOMA KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 18-18, Nomachi 5-chome Kanazawa-shi, Ishikawa-ken 921 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sugita, Katsuhiko c/o Tsudakoma Kogyo K. K., 18-18, Nomachi 5-chome Kanazawa-shi, Ishikawa, 921 / JP | [1996/47] | Representative(s) | Pellmann, Hans-Bernd, et al Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/47] | Pellmann, Hans-Bernd, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96107263.4 | 08.05.1996 | [1996/47] | Priority number, date | JP19950114147 | 12.05.1995 Original published format: JP 11414795 | [1996/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0743383 | Date: | 20.11.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.09.1996 | Classification | IPC: | D03C3/32, D03C1/16, D03D51/02 | [1996/47] | CPC: |
D03C13/025 (EP);
D03C1/16 (EP);
D03C3/32 (EP);
D03D51/005 (EP);
D03D51/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, FR, LI [1996/47] | Title | German: | Antriebsmechanismus für eine Webmaschine | [1996/47] | English: | Loom drive mechanism | [1996/47] | French: | Système d'entraînement pour métier à tisser | [1996/47] | File destroyed: | 13.09.2003 | Examination procedure | 21.05.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1998/06] | 04.09.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1998/06] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]DE9102560U (STAUBLI) [XD] 1,6 * page 1, line 18 - line 29; figure 1 *; | JPH0489579U [ ]; | [A]BE1006781 (PICANOL NV [BE]) [A] 1,6 * figure 1; claim 8 *; | [A]JPH03249233 ; | [A]EP0513728 (TSUDAKOMA IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,6 * figure 1; claim 1 *; | [A]EP0241076 (PICANOL NV [BE]) [A] 1,6 * the whole document * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920204), vol. 016, no. 043, Database accession no. (C - 0907), & JP03249233 A 19911107 (MURATA MACH LTD) [A] 1,6 * abstract * |