EP0742326 - Floor and wall tiles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.11.2000 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.01.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 06.03.2002 [2002/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hopfgartner, Johann Am Lohheider See 8 47495 Rheinberg / DE | [1996/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1996/46] | Application number, filing date | 96107344.2 | 09.05.1996 | [1996/46] | Priority number, date | DE1995117183 | 11.05.1995 Original published format: DE 19517183 | [1996/46] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0742326 | Date: | 13.11.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0742326 | Date: | 19.01.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.08.1996 | Classification | IPC: | E04F15/08, E04F13/14, E04F15/10, E04F13/18 | [1996/46] | CPC: |
E04F13/08 (EP);
E04F15/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, ES, FR, GB, IT [1996/46] | Title | German: | Fliesen und Platten für Bodenbeläge und Wandbekleidungen | [1996/46] | English: | Floor and wall tiles | [1996/46] | French: | Carreaux et dalles pour sols et murs | [1996/46] | Examination procedure | 09.12.1996 | Examination requested [1997/06] | 01.04.1998 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.12.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.02.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.06.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 07.06.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.06.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.07.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.09.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 01.09.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.10.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 09.05.2000 | [2002/10] | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE3235383 (SATOR WALTER) [X] 1 * page 3, line 18 - page 5, line 15; figure 4 *; | [Y]EP0249376 (KNOX COLIN J M) [Y] 1 * column 1, line 1 - column 2, line 47; figures 1-3 *; | [Y]DE8800012U (KRONIMUS & SOHN BETONSTEINWERK UND BAUGESCHAFT GMBH & CO KG) [Y] 1* page 4, line 12 - page 5, line 7; figures 1-3 * | Examination | US2904990 |