EP0745798 - Handle for a sanitary valve [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.07.2003 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.09.2003 [2003/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Friedrich Grohe AG & Co. KG Hauptstrasse 137 58675 Hemer / DE | [2000/26] |
Former [1996/49] | For all designated states FRIEDRICH GROHE AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Hauptstrasse 137 D-58675 Hemer / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Heimann, Bruno Bredde 20 58730 Fröndenberg / DE | 02 /
Köster, Wilfried In den Feldern 10 58710 Menden / DE | 03 /
Lobermeier, Hans Eichendorffstrasse 48 58708 Menden / DE | 04 /
Hochstein, Detlef Unter dem Asenberg 3 58675 Hemer / DE | [1996/49] | Application number, filing date | 96107662.7 | 14.05.1996 | [1996/49] | Priority number, date | DE1995119816 | 31.05.1995 Original published format: DE 19519816 | [1996/49] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0745798 | Date: | 04.12.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0745798 | Date: | 23.07.1997 | [1997/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0745798 | Date: | 11.09.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.06.1997 | Classification | IPC: | F16K31/60 | [1996/49] | CPC: |
F16K31/602 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1996/49] | Title | German: | Stellgriff einer Sanitärarmatur | [1996/49] | English: | Handle for a sanitary valve | [1996/49] | French: | Poignée pour robinet sanitaire | [1996/49] | Examination procedure | 16.09.1997 | Examination requested [1997/46] | 28.10.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.02.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.12.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.04.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.11.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.01.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.03.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.03.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.05.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 23.05.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.06.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]DE2013157 (TOUR AGENTURER) [X] 1,13 * page 6, line 2 - line 5; figures 1,3 *[A] 6; | [XA]DE2148967 (SAMSON APPBAU AG) [X] 1-3,9,11,13 * page 7, line 13 - line 19; figure 6 * [A] 4; | [X]EP0179433 (STANADYNE INC [US]) [X] 1,9-12 * column 3, line 27 - line 48; figures 1-4 *; | [XA]US5236006 (PLATUSICH BRUCE M [US], et al) [X] 1,2,9,11,13 * column 4, line 10 - line 33; figures 3,4 * * column 5, line 16 - line 37; figures 11,13 * [A] 4,10; | [XA]US5326075 (GOFF DAVID W [US]) [X] 1,11,12 * column 3, line 30 - line 43; figures 2,3 * [A] 5,10; | [XA]WO9429623 (DANFOSS AS [DK], et al) [X] 1,11,13 * page 7, line 32 - page 8, line 17; figures 1,2,7 * [A] 10 |