EP0744487 - Method and device for pairing socks [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.04.2000 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.04.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.05.2000 [2000/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CORTESE S.p.A. Via dell'Artigiano, 9 40037 Sasso Marconi / IT | [1996/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cortese, Carmelo Angelo Via Porrettana, 134/4 40037 Sasso Marconi / IT | [1996/48] | Representative(s) | Jorio, Paolo, et al Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1996/48] | Jorio, Paolo, et al Studio Torta, Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 96108107.2 | 21.05.1996 | [1996/48] | Priority number, date | IT1995TO00407 | 24.05.1995 Original published format: IT TO950407 | [1996/48] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0744487 | Date: | 27.11.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0744487 | Date: | 25.06.1997 | [1997/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.05.1997 | Classification | IPC: | D06C5/00 | [1996/48] | CPC: |
D06C5/005 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1996/48] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Paarweise ordnen von Socken | [1996/48] | English: | Method and device for pairing socks | [1996/48] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour l'appariement de chaussettes | [1996/48] | Examination procedure | 22.12.1997 | Examination requested [1998/10] | 06.08.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.12.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2000/22] | 11.01.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2000/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.1999 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2096196 (INTECH CORP) [A] 1,7 * page 1, line 8 - line 88 ** page 4, line 40 - line 118; figures 1-5 *; | [A]EP0652319 (CORTESE CARMELO ANGELO [IT]) [A] 1,7 * column 5, line 45 - column 6, line 23; figure 1 * * column 7, line 4 - line 27 * |