EP0744713 - Method for maintaining mailpiece integrity [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.03.2005 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.03.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.04.2005 [2005/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pitney Bowes Inc. World Headquarters One Elmcroft Road Stamford, CT 06926-0700 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1996/48] | For all designated states PITNEY BOWES INC. World Headquarters One Elmcroft Stamford Connecticut 06926-0700 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chang, Sung S. 84 White Birch Lane Stamford, Connecticut 06905 / US | 02 /
Harman, James L. 710 Mill Hill Road Southport, Connecticut 06490 / US | 03 /
Jacobson, Gary S. 2 Pine Hill Avenue East Norwalk, Connecticut 06855 / US | 04 /
Kirschner, Wesley A. 262 Beacon Hill Road Trumbull, Connecticut 06611 / US | 05 /
Ramadei, Michael J. 248 White Plains Road Trumbull, Connecticut 06611 / US | 06 /
Zuidema, Eric L. 4 Kendall Court Norwalk, Connecticut 06850 / US | [1999/50] |
Former [1996/48] | 01 /
Chang, Sung S. 84 White Birch Lane Stamford, Connecticut 06905 / US | ||
02 /
Harman, James L. 710 Mill Hill Road Southport, Connecticut 06490 / US | |||
03 /
Jacobson, Gary S. 2 Pine Hill Avenue East Norwalk, Connecticut 06855 / US | |||
04 /
Kischner, Wesley A. 262 Beacon Hill Road Trumbull, Connecticut 06611 / US | |||
05 /
Ramadei, Michael J. 248 White Plains Road Trumbull, Connecticut 06611 / US | |||
06 /
Zuidema, Eric L. 4 Kendall Court Norwalk, Connecticut 06850 / US | Representative(s) | Avery, Stephen John, et al Hoffmann Eitle ATTENTION : ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/48] | Avery, Stephen John, et al Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96108115.5 | 21.05.1996 | [1996/48] | Priority number, date | US19950446162 | 22.05.1995 Original published format: US 446162 | [1996/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0744713 | Date: | 27.11.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0744713 | Date: | 15.09.1999 | [1999/37] | Type: | A3 RE Reissue of A-publication | No.: | EP0744713 | Date: | 26.01.2000 | [2000/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0744713 | Date: | 06.05.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.07.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G07B17/00 | [1996/48] | CPC: |
G07B17/00467 (EP,US);
G07B2017/005 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1996/48] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Erhalt einer Poststückintegrität | [1996/48] | English: | Method for maintaining mailpiece integrity | [1996/48] | French: | Procédé pour maintenir l'intégrité de passage des envois postaux | [1996/48] | Examination procedure | 03.03.2000 | Examination requested [2000/18] | 17.06.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.10.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.02.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.06.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.07.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.11.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 05.11.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.02.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH02230493 ; | [A]EP0376740 (PITNEY BOWES INC [US]) [A] 1-5,7,9-11 * abstract * * column 2, line 22 - column 3, line 17 * * column 3, line 49 - line 57 * * column 4, line 11 - line 17 * * column 8, line 42 - column 9, line 4 * * claim 8 *; | [A]US5170397 (HURTZ ROBERT W [US], et al) [A] 1-5,7-9 * abstract * * claims 1-8 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19901130), vol. 014, no. 542, Database accession no. (P - 1137), & JP02230493 A 19900912 (FUJITSU LTD) [A] 1,3,6 * abstract * | by applicant | US19940327246 | US19950421120 |