EP0744749 - Data input circuit of semiconductor storage device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.07.2002 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.07.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.08.2002 [2002/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Oki Electric Industry Co., Ltd. 7-12, Toranomon 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 108 / JP | [1996/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Takenaka, Tetsuro, c/o Oki Electric Ind. Co., Ltd. 7-12, Toranomon 1-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo 108 / JP | [1996/48] | Representative(s) | Kirschner, Klaus Dieter Puschmann Borchert Bardehle Patentanwälte Partnerschaft Postfach 10 12 31 80086 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/48] | Kirschner, Klaus Dieter, Dipl.-Phys. Patentanwalt, Sollner Strasse 38 81479 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96108192.4 | 22.05.1996 | [1996/48] | Priority number, date | JP19950126088 | 25.05.1995 Original published format: JP 12608895 | [1996/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0744749 | Date: | 27.11.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0744749 | Date: | 04.11.1998 | [1998/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0744749 | Date: | 05.09.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.09.1998 | Classification | IPC: | G11C7/00 | [1996/48] | CPC: |
G11C7/1078 (EP,KR,US);
G11C7/22 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, NL [1996/48] | Title | German: | Dateneingangsschaltung einer Halbleiterspeicherschaltung | [1996/48] | English: | Data input circuit of semiconductor storage device | [1996/48] | French: | Circuit d'entrée de données pour dispositif de mémoire à semi-conducteurs | [1996/48] | Examination procedure | 25.02.1999 | Examination requested [1999/17] | 21.01.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.06.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.02.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.03.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.05.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 28.05.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.06.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5028824 (YOUNG WILLIAM R [US]) [A] 1-7 * column 2, line 67 - column 4, line 21; figure 1 *; | [A]EP0302795 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [A] 1-7 * column 4, line 47 - column 5, line 17; figure 3 * |