EP0748888 - Annular position transducer, particularly for circular knitting machines for manufacturing stockings [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.12.2002 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.12.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.01.2003 [2003/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATEC S.p.A. Via delle Nazioni Unite, 1 50018 Scandicci (Firenze) / IT | [1998/37] |
Former [1996/51] | For all designated states MATEC S.r.l. Via delle Nazioni Unite, 1 I-50018 Scandicci (Province of Firenze) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Salucci, Paolo Via Aretina, 142 50136 Firenze / IT | [1996/51] | Representative(s) | Modiano, Guido, et al Dr. Modiano & Associati SpA Via Meravigli, 16 20123 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1996/51] | Modiano, Guido, Dr.-Ing., et al Modiano & Associati S.r.l. Via Meravigli, 16 20123 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 96108430.8 | 28.05.1996 | [1996/51] | Priority number, date | IT1995BO00298 | 13.06.1995 Original published format: IT BO950298 | [1996/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0748888 | Date: | 18.12.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0748888 | Date: | 06.02.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.10.1996 | Classification | IPC: | D04B15/99 | [1996/51] | CPC: |
D04B15/99 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1996/51] | Title | German: | Ringförmiger Positionssensor, insbesondere für Rundstrickmaschinen für die Herstellung von Strümpfen | [1996/51] | English: | Annular position transducer, particularly for circular knitting machines for manufacturing stockings | [1996/51] | French: | Détecteur de position annulaire, notamment pour des machines à tricoter circulaires pour la production de bas | [1996/51] | Examination procedure | 26.05.1997 | Examination requested [1997/30] | 28.07.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.02.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.06.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.10.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.01.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 26.01.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.11.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2266889 (QUICK ROTAN BECKER & NOTZ KG [DE]) [X] 1,2 * page 5, line 8 - page 6, line 10; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US3996772 (GOTTSCHALL GERNOT, et al); | [A]DE3942719 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [A] 1,4 * column 4, line 55 - column 5, line 33; figures 7,12 *; | [A]EP0541838 (SFIM SRL [IT]) [A] 1,5,6 * column 2, line 55 - column 3, line 24; figures 1-4 * |