EP0745821 - Method of manufacturing a heat exchanger with divided header tank [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1996/49] | Heat exchanger with divided header tank | ||
[1998/04] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.11.1998 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.11.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.01.1999 [1999/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sanden Corporation 20 Kotobuki-cho Isesaki-shi Gunma 372-8502 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1996/49] | For all designated states SANDEN CORPORATION 20 Kotobuki-cho Isesaki-shi Gunma, 372 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tsunoda, Masataka, c/o Sanden Corporation 20 Kotobuki-cho Isesaki-shi, Gunma, 372 / JP | [1996/49] | Representative(s) | Prüfer, Lutz H., et al PRÜFER & PARTNER GbR Patentanwälte Harthauser Strasse 25d 81545 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/49] | Prüfer, Lutz H., Dipl.-Phys., et al PRÜFER & PARTNER, Patentanwälte, Harthauser Strasse 25d 81545 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96108486.0 | 28.05.1996 | [1996/49] | Priority number, date | JP19950154034 | 30.05.1995 Original published format: JP 15403495 | [1996/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0745821 | Date: | 04.12.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0745821 | Date: | 21.01.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.09.1996 | Classification | IPC: | F28F9/02 | [1996/49] | CPC: |
F28F9/0212 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1996/49] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Wärmetauschers mit abgeteilter Endkammer | [1998/04] | English: | Method of manufacturing a heat exchanger with divided header tank | [1998/04] | French: | Procédé de fabrication d'un échangeur de chaleur avec collecteur compartimenté | [1998/04] |
Former [1996/49] | Wärmetauscher mit abgeteilter Endkammer | ||
Former [1996/49] | Heat exchanger with divided header tank | ||
Former [1996/49] | Echangeur de chaleur avec collecteur compartimenté | Examination procedure | 28.05.1996 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 22.11.1996 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.11.1996 | Examination requested [1997/03] | 16.01.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.01.1997 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 29.04.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.06.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.07.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.09.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 30.09.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.10.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/02] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP0564761 (LÄNGERER & REICH GMBH & CO) [X] 1-4,11 * column 10, line 10 - column 10, line 20 * * column 11, line 32 - column 12, line 18; figures 1,6 * [Y] 5,8; | [YA]EP0379701 (SÜDDEUTSCHE KÜHLERFABRIK BEHR GMBH & CO KG) [Y] 5,8 * figures 11,12 * [A] 6,7,9,10 |