EP0747067 - Moldable collagen compositions for hard tissue repair and augmentation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.11.1998 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.11.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.12.1998 [1998/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states COLLAGEN CORPORATION 2500 Faber Place Palo Alto, California 94303 / US | [1996/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
McMullin, Hugh R. 2151 Manzanita Menlo Park, California 94025 / US | 02 /
Schroeder, Jacqueline A. 1133 Woodrow Street Redwood City, CA 94061 / US | [1996/50] | Representative(s) | Schwan, Gerhard Schwan Schwan Schorer Patentanwälte Bauerstrasse 22 80796 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/50] | Schwan, Gerhard, Dipl.-Ing. Elfenstrasse 32 81739 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96108504.0 | 29.05.1996 | [1996/50] | Priority number, date | US19950481595 | 07.06.1995 Original published format: US 481595 | [1996/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0747067 | Date: | 11.12.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0747067 | Date: | 30.07.1997 | [1997/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.06.1997 | Classification | IPC: | A61L27/00, C08L89/06 | [1996/50] | CPC: |
C08L89/06 (EP);
A61F2/28 (EP);
A61L27/24 (EP);
A61L27/44 (EP);
A61F2310/00365 (EP)
| C-Set: |
A61L27/44, C08L89/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1996/50] | Title | German: | Verformbare Collagengemische zur Hartgeweberegenerierung und Vermehrung | [1996/50] | English: | Moldable collagen compositions for hard tissue repair and augmentation | [1996/50] | French: | Compositions de collagène moulables pour la réparation des tissus durs et augmentation | [1996/50] | Examination procedure | 31.01.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1998/52] | 15.06.1998 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1998/52] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 13.03.1998 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.1998 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DXY]US4776890 (CHU GEORGE) [DX] 1,11-13 * abstract * * column 2, line 47 - column 2, line 61 * * column 3, line 15 - column 3, line 43 * * column 3, line 27 - column 3, line 43 * * column 3, line 44 - column 3, line 60 * * column 4, line 29 - column 4, line 40 * [Y] 1,2,5-8; | [L]US5001169 (NATHAN RANGA ET AL) [L] 1 * column 6, line 48 - column 6, line 56 * * column 6, line 62 - column 7, line 10 * * L: discloses the composition of the commercially available products Zygen and Zyderm mentioned in US4776890. *; | [YA]EP0330389 (KELMAN CHARLES D M D ET AL) [Y] 1,2,5-8 * page 8, line 28 - page 8, line 29 * [A] 9,10; | [A]US4563350 (NATHAN RANGA ET AL) [A] 1 * abstract * * column 2, line 59 - column 3, line 2 *; | [A]CA2134744 (COLLAGEN CORP) [A] 4,9,15-19 * abstract * * page 5, line 26 - page 5, line 28 * * page 10, line 23 - page 11, line 6 * * page 13, line 3 - page 15, line 21 * * page 25, line 1 - page 27, line 18 * * page 28, line 14 - page 28, line 17 *; | [A]US5238491 (SUGIHARA FUMIHITO ET AL) [A] 3 * column 3, line 61 - column 3, line 67 *; | [A]US4424208 (WALLACE DONALD G ET AL) [A] 14 * abstract * * column 1, line 42 - column 1, line 51 * |