EP0746184 - Circuit arrangement for energy saving operation of electrical loads [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.05.1999 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.05.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.06.1999 [1999/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Römer, Rudolf Rockwinkeler Heerstrasse 86 D-28355 Bremen / DE | For all designated states Albers, Franz-Josef Auf dem Pasch 32 28717 Bremen / DE | [1996/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1996/49] | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 10 60 78 28060 Bremen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/49] | Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Martinistrasse 24 28195 Bremen / DE | Application number, filing date | 96108541.2 | 29.05.1996 | [1996/49] | Priority number, date | DE1995208871U | 01.06.1995 Original published format: DE 29508871 U | [1996/49] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0746184 | Date: | 04.12.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0746184 | Date: | 14.01.1998 | [1998/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.11.1997 | Classification | IPC: | H05B41/00, H05B39/04, H05B41/36, H05B41/40, H05B41/42, H05B41/232, H05B41/04 | [1998/02] | CPC: |
H05B41/42 (EP);
H02M5/06 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1996/49] | H05B41/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1996/49] | Title | German: | Schaltungsanordnung zum energiesparenden Betrieb von elektrischen Verbrauchern | [1996/49] | English: | Circuit arrangement for energy saving operation of electrical loads | [1996/49] | French: | Circuit d'alimentation de charges électriques permettant des économies d'énergie | [1996/49] | Examination procedure | 19.10.1998 | Examination requested [1998/51] | 01.12.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1999/26] | 11.01.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.02.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1999/26] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 08.09.1998 | M01   Fee paid on   19.10.1998 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.1998 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]DE3012869 (SCHUCH LICHTTECH KG ADOLF) [X] 1 * Whole document * [A] 3-5; | [XA]US4956583 (LAWRENCE JOHN A ET AL) [X] 1,2 * column 2, lines 19-69 * * column 6, lines 11-53; figures 1,6 * [A] 3-5; | [A]EP0631372 (STRAND LIGHTING LTD) [A] 1-5 * column 8, lines 2-49; figure 17 * |