EP0745340 - Padding element as well as back pack, shoulder belt and hip belt with a padding element [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1996/49] | Padding element for a back pack | ||
[2001/21] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.06.2003 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 06.02.2008 [2008/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DEUTER SPORT UND LEDER GMBH Feldstrasse 2-6 D-86156 Augsburg / DE | [1996/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Franke, Michael Hornstrasse 18 80797 München / DE | [1996/49] | Representative(s) | LS-MP von Puttkamer Berngruber Loth Spuhler Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB ALPHA-Haus Garmischer Strasse 35 81373 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/49] | Haft, von Puttkamer, Berngruber, Czybulka Patentanwälte Franziskanerstrasse 38 81669 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96108781.4 | 31.05.1996 | [1996/49] | Priority number, date | DE1995120186 | 01.06.1995 Original published format: DE 19520186 | [1996/49] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0745340 | Date: | 04.12.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0745340 | Date: | 31.07.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.09.1996 | Classification | IPC: | A45F3/04 | [1996/49] | CPC: |
A45F3/04 (EP);
A45F2003/125 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1996/49] | Title | German: | Polstereinheit sowie Rucksack, Schultergurt und Hüftgurt mit einer Polstereinheit | [2001/21] | English: | Padding element as well as back pack, shoulder belt and hip belt with a padding element | [2001/21] | French: | Elément de rembourrage ainsi que sac à dos, bretelle et sangle abdominale avec un élément de rembourrage | [2001/21] |
Former [1996/49] | Polstereinheit für einen Rucksack | ||
Former [1996/49] | Padding element for a back pack | ||
Former [1996/49] | Elément de rembourrage pour un sac à dos | Examination procedure | 28.04.1997 | Examination requested [1997/27] | 20.06.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.10.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.07.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01) | 16.08.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.09.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.01.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.04.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 30.04.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.05.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 31.07.2002 | GB | 31.07.2002 | IT | 31.07.2002 | [2008/06] |
Former [2005/49] | FR | 31.07.2002 | |
GB | 31.07.2002 | ||
Former [2004/21] | GB | 31.07.2002 | |
FR | 21.02.2003 | ||
Former [2003/47] | FR | 21.02.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3964653 (STRUTZ GLENN L) [A] 1 * column A; figure 4 *; | [AD]DE2649067 (LEHMANN ERICH DIPL ING) [AD] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US4324012 (CANNADAY SHERIDAN S) [A] 1,2 * column 1, line 28 - column 2, line 26 *; | [A]DE8516418U (DEUTER INDUSTRIEWERKE) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]DE8622768U (HAYLER); | [XP]EP0674861 (BERNHARD GERD [DE]) [XP] 1 * column 8, line 55 - column 9, line 10; figure 16 * |