EP0811902 - LCD assembly with projection function [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.04.1999 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.04.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.06.1999 [1999/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ma, Hsi-Kuang 4F, No. 48, Sec. 2, Chung Cherng Road Taipei / TW | [1997/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1997/50] | Representative(s) | Loven, Keith James, et al Loven Patents & Trademarks West Central Runcorn Road Lincoln LN6 3QP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/50] | Loven, Keith James, et al Loven & Co Quantum House 30 Tentercroft Street Lincoln LN5 7DB / GB | Application number, filing date | 96108921.6 | 04.06.1996 | [1997/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0811902 | Date: | 10.12.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.11.1996 | Classification | IPC: | G06F1/16, G03B21/132, G02F1/133 | [1997/50] | CPC: |
G06F1/1601 (EP);
G03B21/132 (EP);
G02F1/133627 (EP);
G02F1/133628 (EP);
G06F2200/1612 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1997/50] | Title | German: | LCD Anordnung für Projektionszwecke | [1997/50] | English: | LCD assembly with projection function | [1997/50] | French: | Dispositif LCD adapté à la projection | [1997/50] | Examination procedure | 25.04.1997 | Examination requested [1997/50] | 05.06.1997 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 27.10.1997 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, DK, ES, GR, IE, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT | 21.07.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.12.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1999/23] | 12.01.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1999/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 12.08.1997 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 12.08.1997 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 12.08.1997 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 12.08.1997 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 12.08.1997 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 12.08.1997 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 12.08.1997 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 12.08.1997 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 12.08.1997 | LI   M01   Not yet paid | 12.08.1997 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 12.08.1997 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 12.08.1997 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 12.08.1997 | PT   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US5353075 (CONNER ARLIE R [US], et al) [X] 3,5 * column 6, line 01 - line 15 * * column 7, line 35 - line 46 * * column 4, line 54 - line 65; figure 7 * [Y] 1,4; | [Y]JPH046520 ; | [A]JPH031184 ; | [A]EP0375425 (SEIKO INSTR INC [JP]) [A] 1,2 * column 1, line 18 - line 07 * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 16, no. 155, Database accession no. (P - 1338), & JP04006520 A 00000000 (OKI) [Y] 1,4 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 15, no. 107, Database accession no. (P - 1179), & JP03001184 A 00000000 (KONICA) [A] 1,3-5 * abstract * |