EP0747321 - Granulated active carbon and process for its production [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 02.08.2002 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2002 | Refusal of application | published on 18.09.2002 [2002/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI CHEMICAL CORPORATION 5-2, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1996/50] | For all designated states Mitsubishi Chemical Corporation 5-2, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yoshino, Yoshio, c/o Kurosaki Plant Mitsubishi Chem Corp., 1-1, Kurosakishiroishi, Yahatanishi-ku Kitakyushu-shi, Fukuoka 806 / JP | 02 /
Matsumoto, Atsushi, c/o Kurosaki Plant Mitsubishi Chem Corp., 1-1, Kurosakishiroishi, Yahatanishi-ku Kitakyushu-shi, Fukuoka 806 / JP | 03 /
Ohishi, Kimitoshi, c/o Kurosaki Plant Mitsubishi Chem Corp., 1-1, Kurosakishiroishi, Yahatanishi-ku Kitakyushu-shi, Fukuoka 806 / JP | 04 /
Yoshida, Akihide, c/o Kurosaki Plant Mitsubishi Chem Corp., 1-1, Kurosakishiroishi, Yahatanishi-ku Kitakyushu-shi, Fukuoka 806 / JP | [1996/50] | Representative(s) | Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Nymphenburger Strasse 4 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/50] | TER MEER - MÜLLER - STEINMEISTER & PARTNER Mauerkircherstrasse 45 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96108943.0 | 04.06.1996 | [1996/50] | Priority number, date | JP19950139458 | 06.06.1995 Original published format: JP 13945895 | JP19950280727 | 27.10.1995 Original published format: JP 28072795 | [1996/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0747321 | Date: | 11.12.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0747321 | Date: | 05.11.1997 | [1997/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.09.1997 | Classification | IPC: | C01B31/08, C01B31/14 | [1996/50] | CPC: |
C01B32/384 (EP,US);
C01B32/30 (EP,US);
C01B32/312 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1996/50] | Title | German: | Granulierte Aktivkohle und Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung | [1996/50] | English: | Granulated active carbon and process for its production | [1996/50] | French: | Charbon actif granulé et son procédé de production | [1996/50] | Examination procedure | 19.01.1998 | Examination requested [1998/12] | 16.04.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.10.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.08.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.02.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.04.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2002/38] | 28.04.2002 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2002/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2002 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5039651 (KOSAKA HIROAKI [JP], et al) [A] 1,2,4 * column 3, line 3 - line 30 *; | [A]DE4234786 (CARBO CONSULT GES FUER UMWELT [DE], et al) [A] 1,3 * examples 1-3 * * column 2, line 38 - line 40 *; | [A]EP0461802 (BRITISH PETROLEUM CO PLC [GB]) [A] 5-7 * example 1 *; | JPS52153893 [ ] (KOA OIL CO LTD); | [A]US3859421 (HUCKE EDWARD E) [A] 5-7 * column 16, line 11 - column 17, line 38 * * column 29, line 36 - line 41 *; | [A]JPS5629162 ; | [A]US3864277 (KOVACH JULIUS LOUIS); | [A]US4155878 (MILLER CHARLES E [US], et al) [A] 8,11,17,18 * column 1, line 64 - column 2, line 11 * * claim 1 *; | [A]EP0423967 (NORIT UK LTD [GB]) [A] 8,17 * column 4, line 40 - line 43 * * figure 1 *; | [A]FR556686 (PAUL-CHARLES LEMALE) [A] 12-16 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0250382 (SANDVIK AB [SE]) [A] 12-16 * the whole document * | [A] - NOGUCHI KOSAKU & AL., "Granular activated carbon", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19780417), vol. 88, no. 16, Database accession no. 111080, XP002016363 [A] 5-7 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19810527), vol. 005, no. 081, Database accession no. (P - 063), & JP56029162 A 19810323 (SUMITOMO BAKELITE CO LTD) [A] 5 * abstract * |