EP0750030 - Gas refining system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.07.2002 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.09.2002 [2002/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI JUKOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 5-1, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1996/52] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI JUKOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 5-1, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Atsushi, Tatani, c/o Mitsubishi Jukogyo K.K. 5-1, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Makoto, Susaki, c/o Mitsubishi Jukogyo K.K. 5-1, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Kazuaki, Kimura, c/o Mitsubishi Jukogyo K.K. 5-1, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo / JP | 04 /
Taku, Shimizu, c/o Mitsubishi Jukogyo K.K. 5-1, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo / JP | 05 /
Sera, Toshikuni, c/o Mitsubishi Jukogyo K.K. 6-22, Kan-on-shimachi 4-chome, Nishi-ku Hiroshima-shi, Hiroshima-ken / JP | 06 /
Kenji, Inoue, c/o Mitsubishi Jukogyo K.K. 6-22, Kan-on-shimachi 4-chome, Nishi-ku Hiroshima-shi, Hiroshima-ken / JP | [1996/52] | Representative(s) | Behrens, Dieter, et al Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/52] | Behrens, Dieter, Dr.-Ing., et al Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96108964.6 | 04.06.1996 | [1996/52] | Priority number, date | JP19950157688 | 23.06.1995 Original published format: JP 15768895 | JP19950157689 | 23.06.1995 Original published format: JP 15768995 | [1996/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0750030 | Date: | 27.12.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/52] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0750030 | Date: | 04.06.1997 | [1997/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0750030 | Date: | 19.09.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.04.1997 | Classification | IPC: | C10K1/26, B01D53/04, C01F11/46, B01D53/50, B01D53/52, B01D53/73, B01D53/96 | [1997/23] | CPC: |
B01D53/73 (EP,US);
B01D53/501 (EP,US);
B01D53/52 (EP,US);
B01D53/96 (EP,US);
B01J10/002 (EP,US);
B01J19/0066 (EP,US);
B01J19/18 (EP,US);
B01J8/222 (EP,US);
C01F11/464 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1996/52] | C10K1/26, B01D53/04 | Designated contracting states | DE, GB, NL [1996/52] | Title | German: | System zum Raffinieren von Gasen | [1996/52] | English: | Gas refining system | [1996/52] | French: | Système pour le raffinage de gaz | [1996/52] | Examination procedure | 18.06.1997 | Examination requested [1997/34] | 11.12.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.06.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.10.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.02.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.11.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.03.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.06.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 21.06.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.06.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DY]JPH01254226 ; | [Y]WO9118131 (MATERIALS CONCEPTS RES LTD [CA]) [Y] 1,3 * page 5, line 4 - line 27 * * page 7, line 3 - line 37; claims 1-23 *; | [Y]EP0338967 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD [JP]) [Y] 4,5 * figures 1,3; claims 1,2 *; | [A]DE3721421 (DEUTSCHE FILTERBAU [DE]) [A] 1-5 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0604701 (DRAVO LIME CO [US]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]WO8804648 (HOELTER HEINZ [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document * | [DY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890110), vol. 014, no. 007, Database accession no. (C - 673), & JP01254226 A 19891011 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD) [DY] 1,3-5 * abstract * |