EP0748970 - Method and apparatus to dampen the valve lift of a spring-loaded valve [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.10.2002 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.10.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.12.2002 [2002/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ARI-ARMATUREN ALBERT RICHTER GmbH & Co.KG. Mergelheide 56-60 33758 Schloss Holte-Stukenbrock / DE | [2001/51] |
Former [1996/51] | For all designated states ARI-ARMATUREN ALBERT RICHTER GmbH & Co.KG. Mergelheide 56-60 D-33758 Schloss Holte-Stukenbrock / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Stork, Erhard, Dipl.-Ing. Hellingrottstrasse 94 33378 Rheda-Wiedenbrück / DE | [1996/51] | Representative(s) | Stracke, Alexander, et al Loesenbeck - Stracke - Specht - Dantz Am Zwinger 2 33602 Bielefeld / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/51] | Stracke, Alexander, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. Loesenbeck Dipl.-Ing. Stracke Jöllenbecker Strasse 164 Postfach 10 18 82 33518 Bielefeld / DE | Application number, filing date | 96109368.9 | 12.06.1996 | [1996/51] | Priority number, date | DE1995121499 | 13.06.1995 Original published format: DE 19521499 | [1996/51] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0748970 | Date: | 18.12.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/51] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0748970 | Date: | 26.11.1997 | [1997/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0748970 | Date: | 19.12.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.10.1997 | Classification | IPC: | F16K37/00, F16K17/04 | [1996/51] | CPC: |
F16K17/0433 (EP);
F16K37/0041 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1996/51] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Dämpfung des Ventilhubes an federbelasteten Ventilen | [1996/51] | English: | Method and apparatus to dampen the valve lift of a spring-loaded valve | [1996/51] | French: | Procédé et appareil pour l'amortissement de la levée d'une soupape à ressort | [1996/51] | Examination procedure | 26.11.1997 | Examination requested [1998/04] | 07.09.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.03.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.08.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.11.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.07.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.08.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.10.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 06.10.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.09.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS6444515 ; | [A]EP0063968 (SFR ROBINETTERIE SA [FR]) [A] 1 * page 5, line 19 - line 31; figure . *; | [A]US4572237 (THOMPSON LEONARD J [US]) [A] 1 * column 4, line 59 - column 5, line 4; figure . *; | [A]DE3824089 (REXROTH MANNESMANN GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,9 * column 2, line 2 - line 9; figure 1 *; | [A]WO9319317 (ELMEG [DE]) [A] 1,9 * page 4, line 17 - line 28; figure 1 *; | [A]WO9324779 (SIEMENS AG [DE], et al) [A] 1 * page 10, line 7 - line 34; figure 1 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890607), vol. 013, no. 242, Database accession no. (P - 880), & JP01044515 A 19890216 (TLV) [A] 1,9 * abstract * |