EP0750225 - Use of hydroxamic acid derivatives for reducing the amount of residual sensitizing dyes after development processing [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1996/52] | Method for reducing residual sensitizing dyes after development processing | ||
[1999/39] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.08.2001 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJI PHOTO FILM CO., LTD. 210 Nakanuma Minami-Ashigara-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2000/40] | For all designated states FUJI PHOTO FILM CO., LTD. 210 Nakanuma Minami-Ashigara-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | ||
Former [1996/52] | For all designated states FUJI PHOTO FILM CO., LTD. 210 Nakanuma Minami-Ashigara-shi Kanagawa / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ishii, Yoshio, c/o Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd. 210, Nakanuma Minami-Ashigara-shi, Kanagawa / JP | 02 /
Miyashita, Yousuke, c/o Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd. 210, Nakanuma Minami-Ashigara-shi, Kanagawa / JP | 03 /
Mikoshiba, Hisashi, c/o Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd. 210, Nakanuma Minami-Ashigara-shi, Kanagawa / JP | [1996/52] | Representative(s) | Hansen, Bernd, et al Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/52] | Hansen, Bernd, Dr. Dipl.-Chem., et al Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner, Patentanwälte, Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96109407.5 | 12.06.1996 | [1996/52] | Priority number, date | JP19950167825 | 12.06.1995 Original published format: JP 16782595 | [1996/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0750225 | Date: | 27.12.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0750225 | Date: | 04.10.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.10.1996 | Classification | IPC: | G03C7/392 | [1996/52] | CPC: |
G03C7/39236 (EP);
G03C7/39248 (EP);
G03C7/396 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, NL [1996/52] | Title | German: | Verwendung von Hydroxamsaüre Derivate zum reduzieren der Restmenge an Sensibilisierungsfarbstoffen nach der Entwicklungsverarbeitung | [1999/48] | English: | Use of hydroxamic acid derivatives for reducing the amount of residual sensitizing dyes after development processing | [1999/48] | French: | Utilisation de dérivés de l'acide hydroxyamique pour réduire la quantité résiduelle de colorants sensibilisateurs après le traitement de développement | [1999/39] |
Former [1996/52] | Verfahren zum Reduzieren der Restsensibilisierungsfarbstoffen nach der Entwicklungsverarbeitung | ||
Former [1996/52] | Method for reducing residual sensitizing dyes after development processing | ||
Former [1996/52] | Procédé pour réduire la quantité résiduelle de colorants sensibilisateurs après le traitement de développement | Examination procedure | 10.01.1997 | Examination requested [1997/11] | 09.09.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.03.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.09.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.03.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.10.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.01.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.04.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 20.04.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.07.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 04.10.2000 | FR | 04.10.2000 | NL | 04.10.2000 | GB | 12.06.2001 | [2006/14] |
Former [2003/09] | BE | 04.10.2000 | |
NL | 04.10.2000 | ||
FR | 02.03.2001 | ||
GB | 12.06.2001 | ||
Former [2002/37] | BE | 04.10.2000 | |
FR | 02.03.2001 | ||
GB | 12.06.2001 | ||
Former [2002/02] | BE | 04.10.2000 | |
FR | 02.03.2001 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2638525 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD); | [A]EP0240371 (KONISHIROKU PHOTO IND); | [DA]GB2059092 (AGFA GEVAERT AG) |