EP0750299 - A tape driving apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.09.2002 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.10.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 19.11.2008 [2008/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [2008/47] |
Former [2001/44] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Ohaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP | ||
Former [1996/52] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Ohaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hashi, Hideyuki 1821-1-201, Mitsushima Kadoma-shi, Osaka / JP | 02 /
Murata, Shigeki 2-3-16, Rokujo-midorimachi Nara-shi, Nara-ken / JP | 03 /
yoshio, Hideaki 11-14, Hokuto-cho Moriguchi-shi, Osaka / JP | 04 /
Matsuura, Kenji 2-10-D-510, Tsurumai-nishimachi Nara-shi, Nara-ken / JP | [1996/52] | Representative(s) | Kügele, Bernhard, et al Novagraaf International SA Chemin de l'Echo 3 1213 Onex / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1996/52] | Kügele, Bernhard, et al NOVAPAT INTERNATIONAL SA, 9, Rue du Valais 1202 Geneve / CH | Application number, filing date | 96109583.3 | 14.06.1996 | [1996/52] | Priority number, date | JP19950152873 | 20.06.1995 Original published format: JP 15287395 | [1996/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0750299 | Date: | 27.12.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/52] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0750299 | Date: | 26.02.1997 | [1997/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0750299 | Date: | 31.10.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.01.1997 | Classification | IPC: | G11B15/60, G11B15/61 | [1996/52] | CPC: |
G11B15/60 (EP,KR,US);
G11B15/61 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, NL [1996/52] | Title | German: | Bandantriebsgerät | [1996/52] | English: | A tape driving apparatus | [1996/52] | French: | Appareil d'entraînement de bande | [1996/52] | Examination procedure | 14.06.1996 | Examination requested [1996/52] | 21.08.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.12.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.08.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.12.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.02.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.04.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.06.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 18.06.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.08.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0376268 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [A] 1,3 * column A; figures 5A-8 * * column 6, line 16 - column 8, line 21 *; | [A]DE3742828 (GRUNDIG EMV [DE]) [A] 1,4 * column 1, line 54 - column 2, line 27; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US5333770 (KANO KIYOSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1 * column 8, line 63 - column 9, line 30 * * column 13, line 1 - column 15, line 40; figure - *; | [A]EP0365991 (THOMSON BRANDT GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,3 * figure -; claims 1,2 *; | [A]GB2257560 (FUNAI ELECTRIC CO [JP]) [A] 1 * page 13 - page 14; figures 7,9 *; | [A]EP0403651 (JAPAN BROADCASTING CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1 * column A; figure - *; | [A]DE3118241 (LICENTIA GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * page 6, line 18 - line 34; figures 1,2 * |