EP0749227 - Transmission using pulse position coding [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.11.2005 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.11.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.01.2006 [2006/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22 Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi Osaka-fu 545-0013 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2005/03] | For all designated states SHARP KABUSHIKI KAISHA 22-22 Nagaike-cho, Abeno-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka-fu 545-0013 / JP | ||
Former [1996/51] | For all designated states SHARP KABUSHIKI KAISHA 22-22 Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka 545 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kokuhata, Yoshiyuki 2-F7-205, Nishi-tomigaoka Nara-shi, Nara-ken / JP | 02 /
Ise, Masahiro 7-13-22, Shirakashi-cho Kashihara-shi, Nara-ken / JP | [1996/51] | Representative(s) | Müller, Frithjof E., et al Müller Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte Innere Wiener Strasse 17 81667 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/13] | Müller, Frithjof E., Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte MÜLLER & HOFFMANN, Innere Wiener Strasse 17 81667 München / DE | ||
Former [1996/51] | TER MEER - MÜLLER - STEINMEISTER & PARTNER Mauerkircherstrasse 45 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96109595.7 | 14.06.1996 | [1996/51] | Priority number, date | JP19950149257 | 15.06.1995 Original published format: JP 14925795 | [1996/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0749227 | Date: | 18.12.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/51] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0749227 | Date: | 08.11.2000 | [2000/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0749227 | Date: | 19.01.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.09.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H04L25/493 | [1996/51] | CPC: |
H04L25/069 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR [1996/51] | Title | German: | Übertragung durch Pulslagenkodierung | [2004/34] | English: | Transmission using pulse position coding | [1996/51] | French: | Transmission utilisant un codage d'impulsions en position | [1996/51] |
Former [1996/51] | Übertragung durch Pulslagekodierung | Examination procedure | 06.02.2001 | Examination requested [2001/14] | 04.04.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.08.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.09.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.11.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.08.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.11.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 19.11.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.10.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0297623 (BROOKTREE CORP) [X] 1-11 * column 1, line 19 - column 2, line 8 * * column 3, line 4 - column 6, line 17; figures 1,2 *; | [X]US4937468 (SHEKHAWAT SAMPAT S ET AL) [X] 1,3 * column 1, line 54 - column 2, line 9; figures 2,3 * * column 2, line 32 - column 3, line 28 *; | [X]JPH01279621 ; | [A]JPS5830223 ; | [A]JPS61260744 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900131), vol. 014, no. 055, Database accession no. (E - 0882), & JP01279621 A 19891109 (CANON INC) [X] 1,3 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19830511), vol. 007, no. 107, Database accession no. (E - 174), & JP58030223 A 19830222 (MATSUSHITA DENKI SANGYO KK) [A] 1,3 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19870409), vol. 011, no. 113, Database accession no. (E - 497), & JP61260744 A 19861118 (SHARP CORP) [A] 1,3 * abstract * |