EP0756341 - Automatic watering plug for batteries containing liquid electrolyte [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 24.01.2003 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.03.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE | published on 18.04.2007 [2007/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Landau Systemtechnik GmbH Zerresweg 5 41749 Viersen / DE | [1997/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Landau, Reinhard Zerresweg 5 41749 Viersen / DE | [1997/05] | Representative(s) | Manitz, Gerhart, et al Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR Martin-Greif-Strasse 1 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/05] | Manitz, Gerhart, Dr., et al Robert-Koch-Strasse 1 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96109776.3 | 18.06.1996 | [1997/05] | Priority number, date | DE19952011994U | 25.07.1995 Original published format: DE 29511994 U | [1997/05] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0756341 | Date: | 29.01.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0756341 | Date: | 21.04.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.11.1996 | Classification | IPC: | H01M2/36, F16K31/24, F16K31/22 | [1997/05] | CPC: |
H01M50/627 (EP,US);
Y02E60/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1997/05] | Title | German: | Wassernachfüllstopfen für einen flüssigen Elektrolyten enthaltende Batterien | [1997/05] | English: | Automatic watering plug for batteries containing liquid electrolyte | [1997/05] | French: | Bouchon de remplissage automatique pour batterie d'accumulateurs contenant de l'électrolyte liquide | [1997/05] | Examination procedure | 23.07.1997 | Examination requested [1997/39] | 09.10.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.01.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.02.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.06.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.07.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.09.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.12.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 11.12.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
13.01.2000
ADMISSIBLE Rover & Rover GmbH Hirschbergweg 2 82140 Olching / DE Opponent's representative LS-MP von Puttkamer Berngruber Loth Spuhler Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB ALPHA-Haus Garmischer Strasse 35 81373 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/10] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
13.01.2000
ADMISSIBLE Rover & Rover GmbH Hirschbergweg 2 82140 Olching / DE Opponent's representative Haft, von Puttkamer, Berngruber, Czybulka Patentanwälte Franziskanerstrasse 38 81669 München / DE | 29.02.2000 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 05.07.2000 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 27.03.2001 | Date of oral proceedings | 12.04.2001 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 18.12.2002 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2003/11] | 18.12.2002 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | Appeal following opposition | 19.06.2001 | Appeal received No. T0682/01 | 21.08.2001 | Statement of grounds filed | 18.12.2002 | Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in unamended form | 18.12.2002 | Date of oral proceedings | 27.12.2002 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DK | 18.06.2000 | GB | 18.06.2000 | FI | 30.06.2000 | AT | 18.06.2001 | LU | 18.06.2001 | ES | 19.06.2001 | SE | 19.06.2001 | BE | 30.06.2001 | CH | 30.06.2001 | LI | 30.06.2001 | GR | 31.12.2001 | PT | 31.12.2001 | NL | 01.01.2002 | FR | 28.02.2002 | [2007/16] |
Former [2005/24] | DK | 18.06.2000 | |
GB | 18.06.2000 | ||
FI | 30.06.2000 | ||
AT | 18.06.2001 | ||
LU | 18.06.2001 | ||
ES | 19.06.2001 | ||
SE | 19.06.2001 | ||
CH | 30.06.2001 | ||
LI | 30.06.2001 | ||
GR | 31.12.2001 | ||
PT | 31.12.2001 | ||
NL | 01.01.2002 | ||
FR | 28.02.2002 | ||
Former [2004/39] | DK | 18.06.2000 | |
GB | 18.06.2000 | ||
FI | 30.06.2000 | ||
AT | 18.06.2001 | ||
LU | 18.06.2001 | ||
ES | 19.06.2001 | ||
SE | 19.06.2001 | ||
CH | 30.06.2001 | ||
LI | 30.06.2001 | ||
PT | 31.12.2001 | ||
NL | 01.01.2002 | ||
GR | 09.02.2002 | ||
FR | 28.02.2002 | ||
Former [2004/38] | DK | 18.06.2000 | |
GB | 18.06.2000 | ||
FI | 30.06.2000 | ||
AT | 18.06.2001 | ||
ES | 19.06.2001 | ||
SE | 19.06.2001 | ||
CH | 30.06.2001 | ||
LI | 30.06.2001 | ||
PT | 31.12.2001 | ||
NL | 01.01.2002 | ||
GR | 09.02.2002 | ||
FR | 28.02.2002 | ||
Former [2004/16] | DK | 18.06.2000 | |
GB | 18.06.2000 | ||
FI | 30.06.2000 | ||
AT | 18.06.2001 | ||
SE | 19.06.2001 | ||
CH | 30.06.2001 | ||
LI | 30.06.2001 | ||
PT | 31.12.2001 | ||
NL | 01.01.2002 | ||
GR | 09.02.2002 | ||
FR | 28.02.2002 | ||
Former [2003/46] | DK | 18.06.2000 | |
GB | 18.06.2000 | ||
FI | 30.06.2000 | ||
AT | 18.06.2001 | ||
CH | 30.06.2001 | ||
LI | 30.06.2001 | ||
PT | 31.12.2001 | ||
NL | 01.01.2002 | ||
GR | 09.02.2002 | ||
FR | 28.02.2002 | ||
Former [2003/32] | GB | 18.06.2000 | |
FI | 30.06.2000 | ||
AT | 18.06.2001 | ||
CH | 30.06.2001 | ||
LI | 30.06.2001 | ||
PT | 31.12.2001 | ||
NL | 01.01.2002 | ||
GR | 09.02.2002 | ||
FR | 28.02.2002 | ||
Former [2003/19] | GB | 18.06.2000 | |
FI | 30.06.2000 | ||
AT | 18.06.2001 | ||
CH | 30.06.2001 | ||
LI | 30.06.2001 | ||
PT | 31.12.2001 | ||
NL | 01.01.2002 | ||
GR | 09.02.2002 | ||
Former [2003/09] | GB | 18.06.2000 | |
FI | 30.06.2000 | ||
AT | 18.06.2001 | ||
CH | 30.06.2001 | ||
LI | 30.06.2001 | ||
PT | 31.12.2001 | ||
NL | 01.01.2002 | ||
Former [2003/01] | GB | 18.06.2000 | |
FI | 30.06.2000 | ||
CH | 30.06.2001 | ||
LI | 30.06.2001 | ||
PT | 31.12.2001 | ||
NL | 01.01.2002 | ||
Former [2002/48] | GB | 18.06.2000 | |
FI | 30.06.2000 | ||
PT | 31.12.2001 | ||
NL | 01.01.2002 | ||
Former [2001/29] | GB | 18.06.2000 | |
FI | 30.06.2000 | ||
Former [2001/28] | GB | 18.06.2000 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2311412 (EUROP ACCUMULATEURS [FR]) [A] 1-7* the whole document *; | [A]US4386141 (WEIDNER EVERT C, et al) [A] 1-7 * figures 1,2 * * column 2, lines 10-34 *; | [A]US4512378 (OSCHMANN KLAUS [DE]) [A] 1-7 * figures 1,2 * * column 4, lines 27-66 *; | [A]US4696874 (TADIELLO MARIO [IT]) [A] 1-7 * figures 1,3 * * claims 1,2 *; | [A]US4751156 (OLIMPIO STOCCHIERO [IT]) [A] 1-7 * figures 1-3 * * column 4, line 31 - column 5, line 32 *; | [DX]WO9117577 (ROVER DANIEL [DE]) [DX] 1-7 * page 8, line 7 - page 9, line 18 * * claim 1 * * figures 1,2 * |