EP0756845 - Endoscope with a light shield in the window [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 05.05.2001 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.05.2001 | Withdrawal of application | published on 20.06.2001 [2001/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OLYMPUS WINTER & IBE GMBH Kuehnstrasse 61 22045 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/06] | For all designated states OLYMPUS WINTER & IBE GmbH Kuehnstrasse 61 22045 Hamburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wulfsberg, Jens Peter, Dr.-Ing. Klein Hansdorfer Weg 9 22949 Ammersbek / DE | [1997/06] | Representative(s) | Schaefer, Konrad, et al Schaefer Emmel Hausfeld Patentanwälte Krohnstieg 43 22415 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/06] | Schaefer, Konrad, Dipl.-Phys., et al Schaefer & Emmel Gehölzweg 20 22043 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 96109839.9 | 19.06.1996 | [1997/06] | Priority number, date | DE1995125995 | 17.07.1995 Original published format: DE 19525995 | [1997/06] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0756845 | Date: | 05.02.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.12.1996 | Classification | IPC: | A61B1/00, G02B23/24 | [1997/06] | CPC: |
G02B27/0018 (EP,US);
A61B1/00096 (EP,US);
A61B1/00165 (EP,US);
G02B23/2423 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1997/06] | Title | German: | Endoskopoptik mit eine Lichtblende aufweisender Fensterplatte | [1997/06] | English: | Endoscope with a light shield in the window | [1997/06] | French: | Endoscope avec un dispositif de protection empêchant la pénétration de la lumière dans la fenêtre | [1997/06] | Examination procedure | 31.01.1997 | Examination requested [1997/14] | 14.02.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.04.2001 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2001/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]DE3923007 (ASAHI OPTICAL CO LTD [JP]) [DA] 1,6 * column 6, line 13 - line 40 ** figures 7,8 *; | [XA]US5193525 (SILVERSTEIN FRED E [US], et al) [X] 1 * column 9, line 37 - column 12, line 49 * * figures 10-19 * [A] 2,6 |