EP0758000 - Polyimide films from pyromellitic dianhydride and 2,2'-bis(perfluoroalkoxy)benzidines as alignment layers for liquid crystal displays [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.10.2002 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.10.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.12.2002 [2002/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company 1007 Market Street Wilmington, DE 19898 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/51] | For all designated states E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY 1007 Market Street Wilmington Delaware 19898 / US | ||
Former [1997/07] | For all designated states E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY 1007 Market Street Wilmington Delaware 19898 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Auman, Brian Carl 20 Tremont Court Newark, Delaware 19711 / US | 02 /
Bohm, Edgar Brahsstrasse 7 64347 Griesheim / DE | [1997/07] | Representative(s) | Butler, Michael John, et al Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/28] | Butler, Michael John, et al Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | ||
Former [1997/07] | von Kreisler, Alek, Dipl.-Chem., et al Patentanwälte, von Kreisler-Selting-Werner, Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 (Deichmannhaus) 50667 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 96109910.8 | 20.06.1996 | [1997/07] | Priority number, date | US19950512607 | 08.08.1995 Original published format: US 512607 | [1997/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0758000 | Date: | 12.02.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/07] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0758000 | Date: | 19.02.1997 | [1997/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0758000 | Date: | 19.12.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.12.1996 | Classification | IPC: | C08G73/10, G02F1/1337 | [1997/07] | CPC: |
C08G73/1039 (EP,US);
C08J5/18 (KR);
G02F1/133723 (EP,US);
C09K2323/0271 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31721 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1997/07] | Title | German: | Polyimidfilme aus Pyromellitsäureanhydrid und 2,2'-Bis(perfluoroalkoxy)benzidine als Orientierungschicht für Flüssigkristallanzeigevorrichtungen | [1997/07] | English: | Polyimide films from pyromellitic dianhydride and 2,2'-bis(perfluoroalkoxy)benzidines as alignment layers for liquid crystal displays | [1997/07] | French: | Films de polyimide à partir de dianhydride pyromellitique et de 2,2'-bis(perfluoroalkoxy)benzidines pour couches d'alignement d'affichage à cristaux liquides | [1997/07] | Examination procedure | 14.03.1997 | Examination requested [1997/20] | 07.02.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.06.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.08.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 24.08.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.09.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9304033 (DU PONT [US]) [A] 1-8 * claims 1,12-14,20 *; | [D]US5386841 (STILWAGEN EDWARD [US], et al); | [A]JPH04328524 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930330), vol. 17, no. 166, Database accession no. (P - 1514), & JP04328524 A 00000000 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE CORP) [A] 1-10 * abstract * |