EP0751030 - Adjusting device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.02.1998 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.02.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.03.1998 [1998/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BURGER SÖHNE GmbH + Co. Arthur-Gruber-Strasse 33 D-71065 Sindelfingen / DE | [1997/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Helbig, Thorsten, Dipl.-Ing. Böblinger Str. 191 D-70199 Stuttgart / DE | 02 /
Schmidt, Bernd, Dipl.-Ing. Gartenstr. 5 D-75391 Gechingen / DE | 03 /
Klink, Josef, Dipl.-Ing Im Kranisch 5 D-72202 Nagold / DE | 04 /
Dinkel, Emil Lindenstr. 84 D-71272 Renningen / DE | 05 /
Speck, Volker Eschenbrünnle 33 D-71065 Sindelfingen / DE | 06 /
Schneider, Fritz Obere Talstr. 5 D-74706 Osterburken / DE | [1997/01] | Representative(s) | Lasch, Hartmut LICHTI - Patentanwälte Postfach 41 07 60 76207 Karlsruhe / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/01] | Lasch, Hartmut Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte, Dipl.-Ing. Heiner Lichti, Dipl.-Phys.Dr. rer. nat Jost Lempert, Dipl.-Ing. Hartmut Lasch, Bergwaldstrasse 1 76227 Karlsruhe / DE | Application number, filing date | 96110126.8 | 21.06.1994 | [1997/01] | Priority number, date | DE19934321335 | 26.06.1993 Original published format: DE 4321335 | [1997/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0751030 | Date: | 02.01.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.10.1996 | Classification | IPC: | B60N2/22, B60N2/44 | [1997/01] | CPC: |
B60N2/2227 (EP);
B60N2/0296 (EP);
B60N2/933 (EP);
F16D41/08 (EP);
F16D41/084 (EP);
F16D41/088 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [1997/01] | Title | German: | Verstellvorrichtung | [1997/01] | English: | Adjusting device | [1997/01] | French: | Dispositif de réglage | [1997/01] | Examination procedure | 03.07.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1998/13] | 21.10.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1998/13] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP94109567.1 / EP0631901 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 08.08.1997 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.1997 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE1106138 (FEINOPTISCHES WERK GOERLITZ VE) [X] 1-5 * the whole document *; | [X]WO9308410 (SCHAEFFLER WAELZLAGER KG [DE]) [X] 1-5 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0497007 (SCHWARZBICH JOERG [DE]) [X] 1-3,5 * the whole document *; | [X]DE2323640 (SOUTHERN BROTHERS LTD) [X] 1,2,4,5 * page 3 - page 10; figure - *; | [XD]DE3734363 (BURGER SOEHNE [DE]) [XD] 1,2,4,5 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0161410 (HAMMERSTEIN GMBH C ROB [DE], et al) [X] 1 * column A; figure . *; | [X]DE3815602 (BROSE FAHRZEUGTEILE [DE]) [X] 1 * abstract *; | [X]DE3815600 (BROSE FAHRZEUGTEILE [DE]) [X] 1 * abstract *; | [X]DE1925778 (KEIPER FA F) [X] 1 * page 8 - page 17; figures 1-8 *; | [X]DE2526149 (KEIPER KG) [X] 1 * page 5 - page 10; figures 1-6 * |