EP0752223 - Coupling device for light-duty metal set of shelves [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 25.05.2007 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.08.2009 | Change - representative | published on 09.09.2009 [2009/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ANEMOS S.p.A. Via Roma, 18 35010 San Giorgio Delle Pertiche (Padova) / IT | [1997/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Filippi, Giuseppe Via Dante, 66 35100 Padova / IT | [1997/02] | Representative(s) | O'Byrne, Daniel Joseph, et al Maroscia & Associati S.r.l. Contrà Porti, 21 36100 Vicenza / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2009/37] | O'Byrne, Daniel Joseph, et al Maroscia & Associati Srl Contrà Porti, 21 36100 Vicenza / IT | ||
Former [1999/28] | O'Byrne, Daniel, et al c/o Maroscia & Associati S.r.l., 14, Contra Ponte S. Paolo 36100 Vicenza / IT | ||
Former [1998/35] | Wagner, Karl H., Dipl.-Ing., et al WAGNER & GEYER Patentanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [1997/37] | Forattini, Amelia c/o Internazionale Brevetti Ingg. ZINI, MARANESI & C. S.r.l. Piazza Castello 1 20121 Milano / IT | ||
Former [1997/02] | Modiano, Guido, Dr.-Ing., et al Modiano & Associati S.r.l. Via Meravigli, 16 20123 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 96110679.6 | 02.07.1996 | [1997/02] | Priority number, date | IT1995PD00059U | 05.07.1995 Original published format: IT PD950059 U | IT1996PD00098 | 19.04.1996 Original published format: IT PD960098 | [2000/16] |
Former [1997/02] | IT1995PD00059 | 05.07.1995 | |
IT1996PD00098 | 19.04.1996 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0752223 | Date: | 08.01.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0752223 | Date: | 02.05.1997 | [1997/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0752223 | Date: | 26.04.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/17] | Type: | B1 RE Reissue of patent specification | No.: | EP0752223 | Date: | 25.10.2000 | [2000/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.03.1997 | Classification | IPC: | A47B57/22, A47B57/16 | [1997/12] | CPC: |
A47B57/16 (EP);
A47B57/22 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1997/02] | A47B57/22 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, LI, NL [1997/02] | Title | German: | Verbindungsvorrichtung für Leichtbau-Metallregale | [1997/02] | English: | Coupling device for light-duty metal set of shelves | [1997/02] | French: | Dispositif d'accouplement pour des étagères métalliques de construction légère | [1997/02] | Examination procedure | 28.07.1997 | Examination requested [1997/41] | 29.10.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.05.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.07.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.10.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.11.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 18.11.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.03.2000 | Observations by third parties | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
15.12.2000
09.01.2001
ADMISSIBLE META-Regalbau GmbH & Co.KG Eichenkamp 59759 Arnsberg / DE Opponent's representative Basfeld, Rainer Fritz Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 1580 59705 Arnsberg / DE | 02
24.01.2001
18.10.2003
WITHDRAWN KRB GmbH & Co. KG Unterberg II/30 Lippborger Str. 3 59269 Beckum / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/44] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
15.12.2000
09.01.2001
ADMISSIBLE META-Regalbau GmbH & Co.KG Eichenkamp 59759 Arnsberg / DE Opponent's representative Basfeld, Rainer Fritz Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Ostentor 9 59757 Arnsberg / DE | ||
02
24.01.2001
18.10.2003
WITHDRAWN KRB GmbH & Co. KG Unterberg II/30 Lippborger Str. 3 59269 Beckum / DE | |||
Former [2004/34] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
15.12.2000
09.01.2001
ADMISSIBLE META-Regalbau GmbH & Co.KG Eichenkamp 59759 Arnsberg / DE Opponent's representative Fritz, Edmund Lothar, Dipl.-Chem. Patentanwaltskanzlei Fritz Ostentor 9 59757 Arnsberg-Herdringen / DE | ||
02
24.01.2001
18.10.2003
WITHDRAWN KRB GmbH & Co. KG Unterberg II/30 Lippborger Str. 3 59269 Beckum / DE | |||
Former [2003/11] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
15.12.2000
09.01.2001
ADMISSIBLE META-Regalbau GmbH & Co.KG Eichenkamp 59759 Arnsberg / DE Opponent's representative Fritz, Edmund Lothar, Dipl.-Chem. Patentanwaltskanzlei Fritz Ostentor 9 59757 Arnsberg-Herdringen / DE | ||
02
24.01.2001
08.02.2001
ADMISSIBLE KRB GmbH & Co. KG Unterberg II/30 Lippborger Str. 3 59269 Beckum / DE | |||
Former [2002/38] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
15.12.2000
09.01.2001
ADMISSIBLE META-Regalbau GmbH & Co.KG Eichenkamp 59759 Arnsberg / DE Opponent's representative Fritz, Edmund Lothar, Dipl.-Chem. Patentanwaltskanzlei Fritz Ostentor 9 59757 Arnsberg-Herdringen / DE | ||
02
24.01.2001
08.02.2001
ADMISSIBLE KRB GmbH & Co. KG Unterberg II/30 Lippborger Str. 3 59269 Beckum / DE Opponent's representative Schneider, Uwe, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwalt Holbeinstrasse 27 59423 Unna / DE | |||
Former [2002/31] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
15.12.2000
09.01.2001
ADMISSIBLE META-Regalbau GmbH & Co.KG Eichenkamp 59759 Arnsberg / DE Opponent's representative Fritz, Edmund Lothar, Dipl.-Chem. Patentanwaltskanzlei Fritz Ostentor 9 59757 Arnsberg-Herdringen / DE | ||
02
24.01.2001
08.02.2001
ADMISSIBLE KRB GmbH & Co. KG Unterberg II/30 Lippborger Str. 3 59269 Beckum / DE | |||
Former [2001/12] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
15.12.2000
09.01.2001
ADMISSIBLE META-Regalbau GmbH & Co.KG Eichenkamp 59759 Arnsberg / DE Opponent's representative Fritz, Edmund Lothar, Dipl.-Chem. Patentanwaltskanzlei Fritz Ostentor 9 59757 Arnsberg-Herdringen / DE | ||
02
24.01.2001
08.02.2001
ADMISSIBLE KRB GmbH & Co. KG Unterberg II/30 Lippborger Str. 3 59269 Beckum / DE Opponent's representative Schneider, Uwe Holbeinstrasse 27 59423 Unna / DE | |||
Former [2001/09] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
15.12.2000
09.01.2001
ADMISSIBLE META-Regalbau GmbH & Co.KG Eichenkamp 59759 Arnsberg / DE Opponent's representative Fritz, Edmund Lothar, Dipl.-Chem. Patentanwaltskanzlei Fritz Ostentor 9 59757 Arnsberg-Herdringen / DE | 01.03.2001 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 11.09.2001 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 06.02.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M13) | 20.08.2002 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 25.11.2004 | Date of oral proceedings | 18.02.2005 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 18.02.2005 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 22.03.2007 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2007/26] | Appeal following opposition | 11.04.2005 | Appeal received No. T0450/05 | 20.05.2005 | Statement of grounds filed | 22.03.2007 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent was rejected | 22.03.2007 | Date of oral proceedings | 30.03.2007 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2147759 (NICHOLAS SULENTIC) [X] 1,10-12 * page 1, column 2, line 21 - line 42; figures 1-4,8 *; | [A]US3208778 (GORDON BERNHARD H) [A] 2-4,7,9 * the whole document *; | [X]US3240352 (BAKER JR EDWARD A) [X] 1 * figures 1,2; claim 1 *; | [X]DE1554465 (SCHAEFER SERRA MAX) [X] 1,13,15 * figures 1,2; claim 1 *; | [XY]GB1287394 (STRONG BLOCK SPA [IT]) [X] 1 * page 2, line 59 - line 103; figures 1-7 * [Y] 10-12; | [Y]FR2447165 (POZZER GABRIELE [IT]) [Y] 10-12 * page 2, line 38 - page 3, line 5; figures 1-4 *; | [A]EP0102841 (REPUBLIC STEEL CORP [US]) [A] 2-4,7,9,14,15 * abstract * * page 8, line 24 - page 11, line 2 *; | [A]GB2260481 (SAVAGE LTD [GB]) [A] 19* abstract * | other | - "COMPONENTI MINILEG.", COSMET, XX, XX, XX, (20000101), page COMPLETE., XP000889566 | - "METAL POINT - DAS SCHRAUBLOSE REGALSYSTEM.", REGAL TEAM DIRECT, XX, XX, XX, (19990101), page COMPLETE., XP000889567 |