EP0752316 - Ink discharge detection arrangement for an inkjet recording apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.03.2001 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.03.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.05.2001 [2001/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1997/02] | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Saito, Atsushi, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Kohno, Takeshi, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Ono, Takashi, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | 04 /
Kohri, Shinichiro, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | 05 /
Nohata, Yukio, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | 06 /
Sugiyama, Shigeyuki, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [1997/02] | Representative(s) | Pellmann, Hans-Bernd, et al Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/02] | Pellmann, Hans-Bernd, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96110748.9 | 03.07.1996 | [1997/02] | Priority number, date | JP19950168568 | 04.07.1995 Original published format: JP 16856895 | [1997/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0752316 | Date: | 08.01.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0752316 | Date: | 10.05.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.10.1996 | Classification | IPC: | B41J2/165 | [1997/02] | CPC: |
B41J2/16579 (EP,US);
B41J2/17566 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1997/02] | Title | German: | Tintenablagedetektionsanordnung für ein Tintenstrahlaufzeichnungsgerät | [1997/02] | English: | Ink discharge detection arrangement for an inkjet recording apparatus | [1997/02] | French: | Agencement de détection de la décharge de l'encre pour un appareil d'enregistrement par jet d'encre | [1997/02] | Examination procedure | 26.05.1997 | Examination requested [1997/31] | 10.08.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.12.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.07.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.11.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.02.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 09.02.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.02.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH01130948 ; | [A]JPS63260449 ; | [A]EP0443832 (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 1-4 * column 7, line 17 - column 8, line 37; figures 3,5A *; | [A]EP0568173 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [A] * column A * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890821), vol. 013, no. 376, Database accession no. (M - 862)<3724>, & JP01130948 A 19890523 (CANON INC) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890208), vol. 13, no. 55, Database accession no. (M - 795)<3403>, & JP63260449 A 00000000 (SEIKO EPSON CORP.) [A] 1 * abstract * |