EP0753617 - Automatic device for cutting thread chains in sewing machines [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.07.2001 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.07.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.08.2001 [2001/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SCHIPS AG NÄHAUTOMATION Steinacher Strasse 35 CH-9327 Tübach / CH | [1997/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schips, Helmut Klosterweidlistrasse 1 9010 St. Gallen / CH | [1997/03] | Representative(s) | Riebling, Peter Patentanwalt Rennerle 10 88131 Lindau / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/03] | Riebling, Peter, Dr.-Ing. Patentanwalt, Rennerle 10 88131 Lindau / DE | Application number, filing date | 96111000.4 | 09.07.1996 | [1997/03] | Priority number, date | DE19952011402U | 14.07.1995 Original published format: DE 29511402 U | [1997/03] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0753617 | Date: | 15.01.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/03] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0753617 | Date: | 13.08.1997 | [1997/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0753617 | Date: | 06.09.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.06.1997 | Classification | IPC: | D05B65/00 | [1997/03] | CPC: |
D05B65/06 (EP,US);
D05B65/00 (EP,US);
D05B73/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1997/03] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum selbsttätigen Abschneiden von Fadengebilden in Nähmaschinen | [1997/03] | English: | Automatic device for cutting thread chains in sewing machines | [1997/03] | French: | Dispositif de coupe automatique des chaînettes de fil dans les machines à coudre | [1997/03] | Examination procedure | 11.02.1998 | Examination requested [1998/15] | 01.06.1999 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 25.06.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.06.1999 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 04.09.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.10.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.01.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.02.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 17.02.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.06.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US1537155 (ALLEN EDWARD B) [A] 1,2 * page 2, line 7 - line 19 *; | [A]DE1660829 (DUERKOPPWERKE); | [A]DE1945310 (ARTHUR LIERSCH FA) [A] 1,3-5 * claim - *; | [A]DE1685040 (PFAFF AG G M) [A] 1 * column 2, line 18 - line 56 *; | [DA]CH564629 (SCHIPS HELMUT) [DA] 1 * the whole document * |