EP0754670 - Process for preparing fluoroxy- or chloroxy-perfluoroacylfluorides [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.08.2000 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.12.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 11.02.2004 [2004/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AUSIMONT S.p.A. 31, Foro Buonaparte I-20100 Milano / IT | [1997/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Desmarteau, Darryl D. Clemson University, 1007 Berkely Drive Clemson, South Carolina / US | 02 /
Anderson, John D. 1311 Emerson Dr. August, Georgia 30906 / US | 03 /
Navarrini, Walter 46/48 Via A. Moro Boffalora Ticino, Milano / IT | [1997/04] | Representative(s) | Sama, Daniele, et al Sama Patents Via G.B. Morgagni, 2 20129 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1997/04] | Sama, Daniele, Dr., et al Sama Patents, Via G.B. Morgagni, 2 20129 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 96111161.4 | 11.07.1996 | [1997/04] | Priority number, date | IT1995MI01556 | 19.07.1995 Original published format: IT MI951556 | [1997/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0754670 | Date: | 22.01.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0754670 | Date: | 20.08.1997 | [1997/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0754670 | Date: | 06.10.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.07.1997 | Classification | IPC: | C07C51/62, C07C53/46, C07C71/00 | [1997/34] | CPC: |
C07C71/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1997/04] | C07C51/62, C07C53/46 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [1997/04] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Fluoroxy- oder Chloroxy-perfluoracylfluoriden | [1997/04] | English: | Process for preparing fluoroxy- or chloroxy-perfluoroacylfluorides | [1997/04] | French: | Procédé de préparation de fluorures de fluoroxy- ou de chloroxy-perfluoroacyle | [1997/04] | Examination procedure | 07.01.1998 | Examination requested [1998/14] | 29.06.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.09.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.12.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.02.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.04.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 27.04.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.07.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 06.10.1999 | CH | 06.10.1999 | GR | 06.10.1999 | LI | 06.10.1999 | SE | 06.10.1999 | DK | 06.01.2000 | PT | 06.01.2000 | [2004/07] |
Former [2003/46] | AT | 06.10.1999 | |
CH | 06.10.1999 | ||
LI | 06.10.1999 | ||
SE | 06.10.1999 | ||
DK | 06.01.2000 | ||
PT | 06.01.2000 | ||
Former [2002/23] | AT | 06.10.1999 | |
CH | 06.10.1999 | ||
LI | 06.10.1999 | ||
SE | 06.10.1999 | ||
PT | 06.01.2000 | ||
Former [2000/52] | AT | 06.10.1999 | |
CH | 06.10.1999 | ||
LI | 06.10.1999 | ||
PT | 06.01.2000 | ||
Former [2000/51] | AT | 06.10.1999 | |
PT | 06.01.2000 | ||
CH | 11.01.2000 | ||
LI | 11.01.2000 | ||
Former [2000/50] | PT | 06.01.2000 | |
CH | 11.01.2000 | ||
LI | 11.01.2000 | ||
Former [2000/43] | PT | 06.01.2000 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3442927 (THOMPSON PHILLIP G, et al) [X] 11 * claim 16 *; | [A]EP0259817 (AUSIMONT SPA [IT])[A] 1-11 |