EP0754537 - Reusing of blow moulding working fluid for various drive units of a stretch blow moulding machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.06.2002 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.06.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.07.2002 [2002/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states A.K. TECHNICAL LABORATORY, INC. 4963-3, Ohazaminamijo, Sakakimachi Hanishina-gun Nagano-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1997/04] | For all designated states A.K. TECHNICAL LABORATORY, INC. 4963-3, Ohazaminamijo, Sakakimachi Hanishina-gun, Nagano-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ikeda, Minoru, c/o A.K. Technical Lab., Inc. 4963-3, Ohazaminamijo, Sakakimachi Hanishina-gun, Nagano-ken / JP | [1997/04] | Representative(s) | Twelmeier, Ulrich, et al Zerrennerstrasse 23-25 75172 Pforzheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/04] | Twelmeier, Ulrich, Dipl.Phys., et al Westliche Karl-Friedrich-Strasse 29-31 75172 Pforzheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 96111332.1 | 13.07.1996 | [1997/04] | Priority number, date | JP19950202689 | 18.07.1995 Original published format: JP 20268995 | [1997/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0754537 | Date: | 22.01.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0754537 | Date: | 01.08.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.11.1996 | Classification | IPC: | B29C49/78, F15B11/064 | [1997/04] | CPC: |
B29C49/783 (EP,US);
B29C49/12 (KR);
B29B11/08 (KR);
B29C49/06 (EP,KR,US);
F15B11/064 (EP,US);
B29C2949/0715 (EP);
B29C49/4284 (EP,US);
B29C49/42855 (EP);
B29L2022/00 (KR);
F15B2211/20576 (EP,US);
F15B2211/212 (EP,US);
F15B2211/30505 (EP,US);
F15B2211/30525 (EP,US);
F15B2211/31576 (EP,US);
F15B2211/327 (EP,US);
F15B2211/40515 (EP,US);
F15B2211/426 (EP,US);
F15B2211/45 (EP,US);
F15B2211/46 (EP,US);
F15B2211/50518 (EP,US);
F15B2211/50554 (EP,US);
F15B2211/5151 (EP,US);
F15B2211/5152 (EP,US);
F15B2211/55 (EP,US);
F15B2211/615 (EP,US);
F15B2211/7052 (EP,US);
F15B2211/7053 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1997/04] | Title | German: | Weiterverwendung von Blasgas für verschiedene Antriebseinheiten in einer Steckblasformmaschine | [1997/04] | English: | Reusing of blow moulding working fluid for various drive units of a stretch blow moulding machine | [1997/04] | French: | Réutilisation du gaz de soufflage pour les différentes unités d'entraînement d'une machine d'étirage-soufflage | [1997/04] | Examination procedure | 04.03.1997 | Examination requested [1997/18] | 07.04.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.11.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 25.01.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.10.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.01.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.03.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 22.03.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.05.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/30] | Request for further processing for: | 25.01.2000 | Request for further processing filed | 25.01.2000 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 14.02.2000 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2345082 (RAYMOND WASEIGE CHARLES) [A] 1,4* figure - *; | [A]US3400636 (SCHNEIDER ERVIN J) [A] 1,4 * column 1; figure - *; | [X]DE3111925 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1-6 * page 5; figure -; claims 1,2 * * page 9 *; | [DXA]EP0655313 (KRUPP CORPOPLAST MASCH [DE]) [DX] 1,4,5 * column 4, lines 19-25; claims 1,8,11,14 * [A] 2,3,6; | [DA]EP0655314 (KRUPP CORPOPLAST MASCH [DE]) [DA] 1,4 * claims 1,2,10 * |