EP0759637 - Semiconductor package and mounting method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 13.07.2002 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.07.2002 | Withdrawal of application | published on 28.08.2002 [2002/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1997/09] | For all designated states NEC CORPORATION 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Itoh, Nobuyuki c/o NEC Corp., 7-1, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [1997/09] | Representative(s) | Betten & Resch Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 10 02 51 80076 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/09] | Betten & Resch Reichenbachstrasse 19 80469 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96111396.6 | 15.07.1996 | [1997/09] | Priority number, date | JP19950204672 | 10.08.1995 Original published format: JP 20467295 | [1997/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0759637 | Date: | 26.02.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/09] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0759637 | Date: | 30.09.1998 | [1998/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.08.1998 | Classification | IPC: | H01L23/498, H01L21/98, H01L25/10 | [1998/41] | CPC: |
H01L25/50 (EP,US);
H01L25/105 (EP,US);
H01L2225/1023 (EP,US);
H01L2225/1058 (EP,US);
H01L2225/1082 (EP,US);
H01L2924/0002 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/0002, H01L2924/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1997/09] | H01L23/498 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1997/09] | Title | German: | Halbleitergehäuse und Montagemethode | [1997/09] | English: | Semiconductor package and mounting method | [1997/09] | French: | Boîtier à semi-conducteurs et méthode d'assemblage | [1997/09] | Examination procedure | 21.01.1999 | Examination requested [1999/12] | 08.07.2002 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2002/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5006922 (MCSHANE MICHAEL B [US], et al) [A] 1,4,5,7,10 * column 2, lines 5-45; figure 1 *; | [XA]US5321884 (AMEEN JOSEPH G [US], et al) [X] 1,3 * column 3, lines 7-65 * * column 4, lines 45-60; figure 1 * [A] 2,5,6,9; | [A]US5397916 (NORMINGTON PETER J C [US]) [A] 1,5,8 * column 8, line 52 - column 9, line 24; figures 15,16 *; | [X]US5408123 (MURAI TAKASHI [JP]) [X] 1,2 * column 1, lines 40-53; figure 1 * * column 2, lines 42-50 *; | [A]US5440171 (MIYANO ICHIRO [JP], et al) [A] 1,5,8* column 1, line 48 - column 2, line 40; figure 7 * | by applicant | JPS61107675 |