EP0758142 - Halogen incandescent lamp [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.03.2000 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.03.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.05.2000 [2000/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Patent-Treuhand-Gesellschaft für elektrische Glühlampen mbH Hellabrunner Strasse 1 81543 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/07] | For all designated states Patent-Treuhand-Gesellschaft für elektrische Glühlampen mbH Hellabrunner Strasse 1 81543 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Streppel, Hans-Jürgen Waldweg 43 51688 Wipperfürth / DE | 02 /
Liermann, Hans Hachenbergerweg 16 51515 Kürten / DE | 03 /
Eder, Jürgen Thymianweg 13 51061 Köln / DE | [1997/07] | Application number, filing date | 96111637.3 | 18.07.1996 | [1997/07] | Priority number, date | DE1995128686 | 03.08.1995 Original published format: DE 19528686 | [1997/07] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0758142 | Date: | 12.02.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/07] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0758142 | Date: | 13.08.1997 | [1997/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0758142 | Date: | 19.05.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.06.1997 | Classification | IPC: | H01K1/18, H01K1/24 | [1997/07] | CPC: |
H01K1/18 (EP,US);
H01K1/28 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1997/07] | Title | German: | Halogenglühlampe | [1997/07] | English: | Halogen incandescent lamp | [1997/07] | French: | Lampe à incandescence halogène | [1997/07] | Examination procedure | 18.09.1997 | Examination requested [1997/47] | 12.08.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.11.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.02.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 05.02.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.02.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3783329 (MCNEILL F, et al) [A] 1* column A; figure - *; | [DA]EP0143917 (RADIUM ELEKTRIZITAETS GMBH [DE]) [DA] 1-4 * abstract *; | [DX]EP0446458 (PATENT TREUHAND GES FUER ELEKTRISCHE GLUEHLAMPEN MBH [DE]) [DX] 1-5,11,14 * page 5, line 15 - line 49; figure - *; | [A]EP0616359 (PHILIPS NV [NL]) [A] 1 * abstract * |