EP0755133 - Method and apparatus for RSSI measurement in a digital radio system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.02.2005 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.02.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.04.2005 [2005/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 212-8572 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1997/04] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Umemoto, Yuji, c/o K.K. Toshiba 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo 105 / JP | 02 /
Wakabayashi, Naoyuki, c/o K.K. Toshiba 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo 105 / JP | [1997/04] | Representative(s) | Henkel & Partner mbB Patentanwaltskanzlei, Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Maximiliansplatz 21 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/04] | Henkel, Feiler, Hänzel & Partner Möhlstrasse 37 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96111643.1 | 18.07.1996 | [1997/04] | Priority number, date | JP19950185496 | 21.07.1995 Original published format: JP 18549695 | [1997/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0755133 | Date: | 22.01.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0755133 | Date: | 03.05.2000 | [2000/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.03.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H04B17/00 | [1997/04] | CPC: |
H04B17/382 (EP,US);
H04B17/21 (EP,US);
H04B17/24 (EP,US);
H04B17/318 (EP,US);
H04W36/302 (EP);
H04W36/30 (US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [1997/04] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Anordnung zur Messung der Empfangssignalstärke in einem digitalen Funksystem | [1997/04] | English: | Method and apparatus for RSSI measurement in a digital radio system | [1997/04] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour mesurer l'intensité du signal reçu dans un système radio numérique | [1997/04] | Examination procedure | 14.08.1996 | Examination requested [1997/04] | 10.05.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.09.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/15] | 27.10.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2005/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0412235 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [A] 1-8 * claim - *; | [A]US5142695 (ROBERTS GLYN [CA], et al) [A] 1-8 * column 4, line 45 - column 8, line 16 *; | [A]EP0601987 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [A] 1-8* column 3, line 26 - column 6, line 6 *; | [A]US5390365 (ENOKI MASAYUKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-8 * column W *; | JPH0766744 [ ] (NEC CORP); | [A]US5507022 (UOMOTO YASUTOMO [JP]) [A] 1-8 * column W * |