EP0756320 - Semiconductor device and method for manufacturing the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.03.2006 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.10.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 19.11.2008 [2008/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [2008/47] |
Former [2005/21] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-0050 / JP | ||
Former [1997/05] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Segawa, Mizuki 7-11-64, Nagao-motomachi Hirakata-shi, Osaka 573-01 / JP | 02 /
Miyanaga, Isao 996-3, Kido-cho Kawachinagano-shi, Osaka 576 / JP | 03 /
Yabu, Toshiki 4-14-1, Nagaodai Hirakata-shi, Osaka 573-01 / JP | 04 /
Nakabayashi, Takashi 3-13-1-306, Oogaichi-cho Hirakata-shi, Osaka 573 / JP | 05 /
Uehara, Takashi Nishi-1-1609,6, Sotojima-cho Moriguchi-shi, Osaka 570-0096 / JP | 06 /
Yamashita, Kyoji 35-2-407 Butai-cho, Fushimi-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 612-8338 / JP | 07 /
Ukeda, Takaaki 5-2-709, Kikugaoka-minami-machi Hirakata-shi, Osaka 573-0092 / JP | 08 /
Arai, Masatoshi 3-3-43 Shiraniwadai Ikoma-shi, Nara 630-0136 / JP | 09 /
Yamada, Takayuki 4-2-6, Yamashiro-cho Yao-shi, Osaka 581 / JP | 10 /
Matsumoto, Michikazu 82-14 Gokasho-fukuzumi Uji-shi Kyoto 611-0011 / JP | [2005/20] |
Former [2005/16] | 01 /
Segawa, Mizuki 7-11-64, Nagao-motomachi Hirakata-shi, Osaka 573-01 / JP | ||
02 /
Miyanaga, Isao 996-3, Kido-cho Kawachinagano-shi, Osaka 576 / JP | |||
03 /
Yabu, Toshiki 4-14-1, Nagaodai Hirakata-shi, Osaka 573-01 / JP | |||
04 /
Nakabayashi, Takashi 3-13-1-306, Oogaichi-cho Hirakata-shi, Osaka 573 / JP | |||
05 /
Uehara, Takashi Nishi-1-1609,6, Sotojima-cho Moriguchi-shi, Osaka 570-0096 / JP | |||
06 /
Yamashita, Kyoji 35-2-407 Butai-cho, Fushimi-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 612-8338 / JP | |||
07 /
Ukeda, Takaaki 5-2-709, Kikugaoka-minami-machi Hirakata-shi, Osaka 573-0092 / JP | |||
08 /
Arai, Masatoshi 3-3-3 Shiraniwadai Ikoma-shi, Nara 630-0136 / JP | |||
09 /
Yamada, Takayuki 4-2-6, Yamashiro-cho Yao-shi, Osaka 581 / JP | |||
10 /
Matsumoto, Michikazu 82-14 Gokasho-fukuzumi Uji-shi Kyoto 611-0011 / JP | |||
Former [1997/05] | 01 /
Segawa, Mizuki 7-11-64, Nagao-motomachi Hirakata-shi, Osaka 573-01 / JP | ||
02 /
Miyanaga, Isao 996-3, Kido-cho Kawachinagano-shi, Osaka 576 / JP | |||
03 /
Yabu, Toshiki 4-14-1, Nagaodai Hirakata-shi, Osaka 573-01 / JP | |||
04 /
Nakabayashi, Takashi 3-13-1-306, Oogaichi-cho Hirakata-shi, Osaka 573 / JP | |||
05 /
Uehara, Takashi 6-Nishi 1-1506, Sotoshima-cho Moriguchi-shi, Osaka 570 / JP | |||
06 /
Yamashita, Kyoji 1-4-40-554, Nonaka-minami, Yodogawa-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 532 / JP | |||
07 /
Ukeda, Takaaki 6-2-205, Myokenzaka Katano-shi, Osaka 576 / JP | |||
08 /
Arai, Masatoshi 1-4-40-741, Nonaka-minami, Yodogawa-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 532 / JP | |||
09 /
Yamada, Takayuki 4-2-6, Yamashiro-cho Yao-shi, Osaka 581 / JP | |||
10 /
Matsumoto, Michikazu 5-26-6, Fujita-cho Moriguchi-shi, Osaka 570 / JP | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/05] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96112122.5 | 26.07.1996 | [1997/05] | Priority number, date | JP19950192181 | 27.07.1995 Original published format: JP 19218195 | JP19950330112 | 19.12.1995 Original published format: JP 33011295 | [1997/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0756320 | Date: | 29.01.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/05] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0756320 | Date: | 01.04.1998 | [1998/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0756320 | Date: | 25.05.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.02.1998 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/762, H01L21/768 | [1997/05] | CPC: |
H01L29/6659 (EP,US);
H01L21/76224 (EP,US);
H01L29/665 (EP,US);
H01L2924/0002 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/0002, H01L2924/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1997/05] | Title | German: | Halbleiteranordnung und Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung | [1997/05] | English: | Semiconductor device and method for manufacturing the same | [1997/05] | French: | Dispositif semi-conducteur et procédé de fabrication | [1997/05] | Examination procedure | 15.05.1998 | Examination requested [1998/29] | 16.11.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.05.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.11.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.02.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.07.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.10.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.08.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.11.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 24.11.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP04025951.7 / EP1503410 | Opposition(s) | 28.02.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP0243988 (PHILIPS NV [NL]) [X] 1,6,12,18,20-24 * abstract * * column 2, line 43 - column 3, line 4 * * column 4, line 5 - line 12 * * column 5, line 33 - line 50 * * column 6, line 39 - column 7, line 17 * [Y] 1,2,4,5,12-17,31,33; | [X]US5401673 (URAYAMA TAKEHIRO [JP]) [X] 1,6 * abstract * * column 1, line 49 - line 68 * * column 2, line 57 - column 3, line 5 *; | [YA]EP0513639 (IBM [US]) [Y] 1,2,4,5,12,13 * abstract * * column 1, line 40 - column 2, line 3 * * column 8, line 41 - column 9, line 30 * [A] 18,20-24,31,35,37; | [Y]US5433794 (FAZAN PIERRE C [US], et al) [Y] 14-17 * abstract * * column 1, line 22 - line 51 *; | [Y]US5177028 (MANNING MONTE [US]) [Y] 31,33 * abstract *; | [A]US5397910 (ISHIMARU KAZUNARI [JP]) [A] 1,6,9,18,22,25 * abstract * * column 1, line 43 - line 47 * * column 3, line 64 - column 5, line 4 *; | [A]US5286674 (ROTH SCOTT S [US], et al) [A] 1,6,8 * abstract * |