EP0785553 - Method and apparatus for minimizing seek time in a disk drive [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.08.2003 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.09.2003 [2003/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/13] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company, A Delaware Corporation 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US | ||
Former [1997/30] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto, California 94304 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Knowles, Vernon L. 1166 W. Stafford Dr. Eagle, ID 83616 / US | [1997/30] | Representative(s) | Schoppe, Fritz Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler & Zinkler Patentanwälte Postfach 246 82043 Pullach bei München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/30] | Schoppe, Fritz, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwalt, P.O. Box 71 08 67 81458 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96112163.9 | 26.07.1996 | [1997/30] | Priority number, date | US19960586429 | 16.01.1996 Original published format: US 586429 | [1997/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0785553 | Date: | 23.07.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0785553 | Date: | 25.09.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.05.1997 | Classification | IPC: | G11B21/08, G11B5/55, G11B19/02 | [1997/30] | CPC: |
G11B5/5547 (EP,US);
G11B21/083 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1997/30] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Gerät zur Minimierung der Suchzeit in einem Plattenlaufwerk | [1997/30] | English: | Method and apparatus for minimizing seek time in a disk drive | [1997/30] | French: | Méthode et appareil pour diminuer le temps d'accès dans un entraînement de disque | [1997/30] | Examination procedure | 15.07.1997 | Examination requested [1997/37] | 31.01.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.04.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.07.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 08.07.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.06.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2078030 (BURROUGHS CORP) [A] 1-6,9,10 * abstract * * page 1, line 100 - page 2, line 110 * * claims 1,2 *; | [A]US4591933 (QUACKENBUSH JAMES E [US]); | [A]EP0335650 (IBM [US]); | [A]EP0361786 (IBM [US]) [A] 1-10 * page 2, line 26 - page 3, line 10 * * page 4, line 22 - page 5, line 21 * * page 6, line 11 - page 7, line 31 * * figures 3,4 *; | [A]EP0461915 (IBM [US]) [A] 1-4,6,9 * abstract * * page 2, line 47 - page 4, line 13 * * page 5, line 3 - page 6, line 3 * * page 9, line 8 - page 10, line 4 * * figure 3 * |